EP3760233 - ONE-POT PREPARATION PROCESS FOR ANTIBODY DRUG CONJUGATE INTERMEDIATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, RO, SK | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MabPlex International Co., Ltd. No. 60, Beijing Middle Road Yantai Development Zone Yantai District China (Shandong) Pilot Free Trade Zone Shandong 264006 / CN | [2021/25] |
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states Mabplex International, Ltd. No. 60, Beijing Middle Road Economic And Technological Development Zone Yantai, Shandong 264006 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Zhaoxing No. 60, Beijing Middle Road Yantal Development Zone Yantai District, China (Shandong ) Pilot Free Trade Zone Shandong 264006 / CN | 02 /
LI, Xinfang No. 60, Beijing Middle Road Yantal Development Zone Yantai District, China (Shandong ) Pilot Free Trade Zone Shandong 264006 / CN | 03 /
LAN, Mingchao No. 60, Beijing Middle Road Yantal Development Zone Yantai District, China (Shandong ) Pilot Free Trade Zone Shandong 264006 / CN | 04 /
MAO, Xinjie No. 60, Beijing Middle Road Yantal Development Zone Yantai District, China (Shandong ) Pilot Free Trade Zone Shandong 264006 / CN | [2021/25] |
Former [2021/12] | 01 /
YU, Zhaoxing No. 60, Beijing Middle Road Yantal Development Zone Yantai District, China (Shandong ) Pilot Free Trade Zone 264006 / CN | ||
02 /
LI, Xinfang No. 60, Beijing Middle Road Yantal Development Zone Yantai District, China (Shandong ) Pilot Free Trade Zone 264006 / CN | |||
03 /
LAN, Mingchao No. 60, Beijing Middle Road Yantal Development Zone Yantai District, China (Shandong ) Pilot Free Trade Zone 264006 / CN | |||
04 /
MAO, Xinjie No. 60, Beijing Middle Road Yantal Development Zone Yantai District, China (Shandong ) Pilot Free Trade Zone 264006 / CN | |||
Former [2021/01] | 01 /
YU, Zhaoxing No. 60, Beijing Middle Road Economic And Technological Development Zone yantai, Shandong 264006 / CN | ||
02 /
LI, Xinfang No. 60, Beijing Middle Road Economic And Technological Development Zone yantai, Shandong 264006 / CN | |||
03 /
LAN, Mingchao No. 60, Beijing Middle Road Economic And Technological Development Zone yantai, Shandong 264006 / CN | |||
04 /
MAO, Xinjie No. 60, Beijing Middle Road Economic And Technological Development Zone yantai, Shandong 264006 / CN | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 20733678.5 | 13.02.2020 | [2021/01] | WO2020CN74987 | Priority number, date | CN201910420868 | 20.05.2019 Original published format: CN201910420868 | CN201910916200 | 26.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910916200 | CN201910916510 | 26.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910916510 | CN201910916508 | 26.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910916508 | CN201910916198 | 26.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910916198 | CN201910916470 | 26.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910916470 | CN201910916242 | 26.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910916242 | [2021/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020233174 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3760233 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3760233 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, A61P35/00 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A61K47/6889 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K47/65 (KR,RU,US);
A61K47/6803 (KR);
A61K31/40 (KR);
A61K47/6801 (US);
A61K47/68031 (EP,RU,US);
A61K47/68037 (EP,RU,US);
A61K47/6809 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,RU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINTOPFVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ZWISCHENPRODUKTES EINES ANTIKÖRPER-WIRKSTOFF-KONJUGATS | [2021/01] | English: | ONE-POT PREPARATION PROCESS FOR ANTIBODY DRUG CONJUGATE INTERMEDIATE | [2021/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION MONOTOPE D'UN INTERMÉDIAIRE CONJUGUÉ DE MÉDICAMENT- ANTICORPS | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2020 | Translation filed | 29.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 25.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 12.10.2023 | |
GR | 13.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN109200291 (INST MED BIOTECHNOLOGY CAMS) | International search | [A]WO2007008603 (SEATTLE GENETICS INC [US], et al); | [A]CN103933575 (SHANGHAI XINLINIAN BIOPHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]CN107427591 (MEDSHINE DISCOVERY INC); | [A]CN107921030 (RC BIOTECHNOLOGIES INC); | [A]CN108727498 (SICHUAN BAILI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD); | [A]CN108727499 (SICHUAN BAILI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD); | [PA]CN110507824 (REMEGEN LTD) | by applicant | CN107427591 | CN107921030 |