Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022411713 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1907180 | 28.06.2019 | WO2020EP68122 | 26.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220059470 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1907180 | 28.06.2019 | WO2020EP68122 | 26.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022539199 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1907180 | 28.06.2019 | WO2020EP68122 | 26.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114026208B | Global Dossier | 25.10.2022 | B | CN114026208 | 08.02.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1907180 | 28.06.2019 | WO2020EP68122 | 26.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3990591 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1907180 | 28.06.2019 | WO2020EP68122 | 26.06.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020260650 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1907180 | 28.06.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3097875 | 04.03.2022 | B1 | FR3097875 | 01.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1907180 | 28.06.2019 |