EP4028785 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REMOTE INTELLIGENT TROUBLESHOOTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AFANADOR, Jairo, Abraham P.O. Box 1332 Allen, TX 75013 / US | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 20734456.5 | 02.06.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020US35701 | Priority number, date | US201916570901 | 13.09.2019 Original published format: US201916570901 | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021050124 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4028785 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28, // G06N3/042 | [2024/38] | CPC: |
G01R31/2806 (EP);
G01R31/31718 (US);
G01R31/2803 (EP);
G01R31/2815 (EP);
G01R31/2818 (EP);
G01R31/2846 (EP);
G01R31/3177 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N5/02 (US);
G06N3/042 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/29] | G01R31/28, G06N3/04, G06F11/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR INTELLIGENTEN FEHLERSUCHE AUS DER FERNE | [2024/38] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REMOTE INTELLIGENT TROUBLESHOOTING | [2022/29] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPANNAGE INTELLIGENT À DISTANCE | [2022/29] |
Former [2022/29] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR FERNINTELLIGENTEN FEHLERSUCHE | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 11.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006036390 (LOH AIK K [SG], et al); | [Y]CN101806857 (INST OF ORDNANCE TECHNOLOGY THE GENERAL ARMAMENT DEPT PLA); | [A]CN102621481 (HENAN ZHENGTAIXIN INNOVATION BASE CO LTD); | [Y]US2012233104 (WANG ZHIYUAN [US], et al); | [A]US2016005242 (HUA TRI T [US], et al); | [A]CN109725247 (TEAMVIEWER SHANGHAI NETWORK TECH CO LTD); |