EP3991213 - METHOD FOR HOMOGENISING THE CROSS-SECTION OF NANOWIRES FOR LIGHT-EMITTING DIODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aledia Parc d'Entreprises Sud Galaxie 10 Rue des Méridiens 38130 Echirolles / FR | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université Grenoble Alpes 621 avenue Centrale 38400 Saint-Martin-d'Hères / FR | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAUDIN, Bruno-Jules c/o CEA GRENOBLE 17 Avenue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 9 / FR | 02 /
CHIKHAOUI, Walf 8 Impasse Saint Exupéry 38500 VOIRON / FR | 03 /
GRUART, Marion 22 Rue Adolpe Muguet 38120 SAINT-EGREVE / FR | 04 /
GILET, Philippe 115 Chemin Le Breton 38470 TECHE / FR | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20734543.0 | 25.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020EP67959 | Priority number, date | FR20190006896 | 25.06.2019 Original published format: FR 1906896 | [2022/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020260541 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3991213 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01L33/08, H01L33/18, H01L33/20, H01L33/30, H01L25/075, H01L27/15, H01L33/32 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
B29C45/14639 (EP);
B29C45/0055 (EP);
H01L25/0753 (EP);
H01L27/156 (EP);
H01L33/0062 (EP);
H01L33/08 (EP);
H01L33/18 (EP);
H01L33/20 (EP);
H01L33/30 (EP);
B29C2045/0058 (EP);
B29C45/14811 (EP);
B60R16/0207 (EP);
H01L33/0066 (EP);
H01L33/007 (EP);
H01L33/0075 (EP);
H01L33/32 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HOMOGENISIERUNG DES QUERSCHNITTS VON NANODRÄHTEN FÜR LICHTEMITTIERENDE DIODEN | [2022/18] | English: | METHOD FOR HOMOGENISING THE CROSS-SECTION OF NANOWIRES FOR LIGHT-EMITTING DIODES | [2022/18] | French: | PROCEDE D'HOMOGENEISATION DE LA SECTION DE NANOFILS POUR DIODES ELECTROLUMINESCENTES | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 20.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]EP1796180 (KIKUCHI AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [I] 1-4,10-12 * paragraphs [0001] - [0055]; figures 1-8 * [A] 5-9; | [XI]US2014110664 (LO I-KAI [TW], et al) [X] 1-4,10-12 * paragraphs [0001] - [0081] - [ 0090] - [0102]; figures 1-4, 8, 9 * [I] 5-9; | [XI]US2016365480 (MI ZETIAN [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,7,10-12 * paragraphs [0001] - [0075]; figures 1-4 * [I] 5,6,8,9; | [A]FR3044470 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [XI]WO2019002786 (ALEDIA [FR]) [X] 1-4,10-12 * the whole document * [I] 5-9 | by applicant | FR2997557 | US9728680 | FR20190006898 |