EP4010154 - METHOD FOR SEPARATING PRINTED PRODUCTS THAT ARE PRINTED TOGETHER ONTO A SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Str. 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUMM, Florian Raiffeisenstr. 14 97318 Kitzingen-Sickershausen / DE | 02 /
DRAGOZ, Dragan Les Perrières 5 1072 Forel (Lavaux) / CH | 03 /
PAWELAK, Thomas An der Oberen Mühle 34 97273 Kürnach / DE | 04 /
SAUER, Jens Goethestr. 11a 97072 Würzburg / DE | 05 /
SCHAEDE, Johannes Max-Heim-Str. 8 97074 Würzburg / DE | 06 /
SCHUBERT, Julian Obere Klimbach 8d 97842 Karbach / DE | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Koenig & Bauer AG - Lizenzen - Patente - Friedrich-Koenig-Straße 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20734665.1 | 17.06.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020EP66742 | Priority number, date | DE201910121401 | 08.08.2019 Original published format: DE102019121401 | [2022/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021023421 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4010154 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4010154 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B26D5/00, B26D5/32 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
B26D5/32 (EP,CN);
B41F13/58 (EP,US);
B26D5/007 (EP,CN);
B41F13/60 (EP,US);
B41F33/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VEREINZELN VON GEMEINSAM AUF EINEN BOGEN GEDRUCKTEN DRUCKPRODUKTEN | [2022/24] | English: | METHOD FOR SEPARATING PRINTED PRODUCTS THAT ARE PRINTED TOGETHER ONTO A SHEET | [2022/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE PRODUITS IMPRIMÉS, IMPRIMÉS ENSEMBLE SUR UNE FEUILLE | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2021 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 01.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4653399 (KUEHFUSS RUNWALT [DE]); | [A]US6112658 (GUNTHER WILLIAM G [US], et al); | [A]DE102008054019 (MANROLAND AG [DE]); | [A]ITUB20152764 (PETRATTO GIORGIO [IT], et al) | by applicant | WO0115091 | WO0248014 | WO03082574 | DE102005012913 | DE102008054019 | DE102012017636 |