EP3990790 - CONSTRUCTION KIT WITH HYDRAULIC CONTROL BLOCK AND HYDRAULIC AXLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/18] | HYDRAULIC CONTROL BLOCK AND HYDRAULIC AXLE THEREWITH | ||
[2024/36] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change - German title | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - English title | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - French title | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNKER, Markus Alfred-Delp-Strasse 7 63801 Kleinostheim / DE | 02 /
RUMPEL, Manuel Hauptstrasse 50 97753 Karlstadt / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20734677.6 | 19.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020EP67071 | Priority number, date | DE201910209328 | 27.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019209328 | DE201910210622 | 18.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019210622 | [2022/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020260146 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3990790 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F15B21/00, F15B15/18, F15B15/20, F15B13/00 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
F15B21/003 (EP,US);
F15B15/18 (EP);
F15B15/202 (EP,US);
F15B2013/006 (EP,US);
F15B2211/7053 (EP);
F15B2211/7054 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | BAUSATZ MIT HYDRAULIK-STEUERBLOCK UND HYDRAULISCHE ACHSE | [2024/36] | English: | CONSTRUCTION KIT WITH HYDRAULIC CONTROL BLOCK AND HYDRAULIC AXLE | [2024/36] | French: | KIT DE CONSTRUCTION AVEC BLOC DE COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE ET AXE HYDRAULIQUE | [2024/36] |
Former [2022/18] | HYDRAULIK-STEUERBLOCK UND HYDRAULISCHE ACHSE DAMIT | ||
Former [2022/18] | HYDRAULIC CONTROL BLOCK AND HYDRAULIC AXLE THEREWITH | ||
Former [2022/18] | BLOC DE COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE ET ARBRE HYDRAULIQUE ÉQUIPÉ DUDIT BLOC DE COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 27.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3233523 (CHARLES PASSAGGIO); | [XI]US3824900 (MC LELLAND J); | [XI]EP1316732 (FESTO AG & CO [DE]); | [XI]WO2005106257 (BOSCH REXROTH AG [DE], et al); | [A]WO2012167892 (TOX PRESSOTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al); | [XI]WO2018202290 (FESTO AG & CO KG [DE]) |