EP3963297 - ELECTROMAGNETIC CONVEYOR WITH WEIGHING STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CH, SI | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B&R Industrial Automation GmbH B&R Straße 1 5142 Eggelsberg / AT | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DERRICK, Stacey 115 Marona Street NE Atlanta, Georgia 30307 / US | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Pinter & Weiss OG Prinz-Eugen-Straße 70 1040 Wien / AT | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20735379.8 | 29.06.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020EP68274 | Priority number, date | US201916458406 | 01.07.2019 Original published format: US201916458406 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021001319 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3963297 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3963297 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/03 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
G01G19/03 (EP);
B65G35/00 (CN);
G01G11/003 (US);
B65G54/02 (US);
G01G11/04 (US);
G01G19/52 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER FÖRDERER MIT WIEGESTATION | [2022/10] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC CONVEYOR WITH WEIGHING STATION | [2022/10] | French: | TRANSPORTEUR ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE AVEC STATION DE PESÉE | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 30.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2023 | CZ | 24.05.2023 | DK | 24.05.2023 | EE | 24.05.2023 | ES | 24.05.2023 | FI | 24.05.2023 | HR | 24.05.2023 | LT | 24.05.2023 | LV | 24.05.2023 | MC | 24.05.2023 | NL | 24.05.2023 | PL | 24.05.2023 | RO | 24.05.2023 | RS | 24.05.2023 | SE | 24.05.2023 | SI | 24.05.2023 | SK | 24.05.2023 | SM | 24.05.2023 | IE | 29.06.2023 | LU | 29.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | NO | 24.08.2023 | GR | 25.08.2023 | IS | 24.09.2023 | PT | 25.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/21] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
IE | 29.06.2023 | ||
LU | 29.06.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
LU | 29.06.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 24.05.2023 | |
PT | 25.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB696795 (AMERICAN VISCOSE CORP) [X] 8 * figures 1-5 * * page 3, lines 15-64 * [A] 1-7,9-15; | [AD]US2017081052 (AICHINGER KARL [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15* abstract *; | [XI]US2018229866 (EBERHARDT ALBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8,11,12,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0028] - [0037] , [0064] * [I] 2,3,6,7,9,10,13,14; | [XI]US10308437 (CLÖSSNER STEPHAN [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8,11,12,15 * abstract * * column 2, lines 48-53 * * column 3, lines 38-43 * * column 4, lines 7-11 * * column 6, lines 15-24 * * column 7, lines 20-36 * * column 9, lines 42-46 * * column 13, line 12 - column 14, line 63 * [I] 2,3,6,7,9,10,13,14 | by applicant | WO9850760 | US9202719 | US2016380562 | US2017081052 | US2018073912 | WO2018176137 | US2019002204 |