Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3947734 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2020251324 CA3135315 CN202080032442 EP19166374 EP20735449 IB2020000236 IL28663821 JP2021560197 KR20217034690 US202017599681



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2022195533Global Dossier 23.06.2022A1
Priority number Date
EP19166374 29.03.2019
WO2020IB00236 28.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20210148220Global Dossier 07.12.2021A
Priority number Date
EP19166374 29.03.2019
WO2020IB00236 28.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2022528944Global Dossier 16.06.2022A
Priority number Date
EP19166374 29.03.2019
WO2020IB00236 28.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL286638Global Dossier 01.12.2021A
Priority number Date
EP19166374 29.03.2019
WO2020IB00236 28.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN114127311Global Dossier 01.03.2022A
Priority number Date
EP19166374 29.03.2019
WO2020IB00236 28.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3135315Global Dossier 08.10.2020A1
Priority number Date
EP19166374 29.03.2019
WO2020IB00236 28.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2020251324Global Dossier 18.11.2021A1
Priority number Date
EP19166374 29.03.2019
WO2020IB00236 28.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3947734Global Dossier 09.02.2022A2
Priority number Date
EP19166374 29.03.2019
WO2020IB00236 28.03.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2020201825Global Dossier 26.11.2020A3
WO2020201825 08.10.2020A2
Priority number Date
EP19166374 29.03.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3715471Global Dossier 30.09.2020A1
Priority number Date
EP19166374 29.03.2019