EP3993625 - FEED ADDITIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nutreco IP Assets B.V. Veerstraat 38 5831 JN Boxmeer / NL | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUINENBERG, Paul, Gerard c/o 38, Veerstraat 5831 JN BOXMEER / NL | 02 /
KLEINHOVEN, Petrus, Elbertus, Maria c/o 38, Veerstraat 5831 JN BOXMEER / NL | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20735614.8 | 06.07.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020EP69029 | Priority number, date | EP20190184485 | 04.07.2019 Original published format: EP 19184485 | EP20190202756 | 11.10.2019 Original published format: EP 19202756 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021001578 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993625 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/02, A23K20/158, A01P1/00, A01P3/00 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
A23K20/105 (EP);
A01N37/02 (EP);
A23K20/158 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N37/02, A01N25/30, A01N37/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | FUTTERZUSATZ | [2022/19] | English: | FEED ADDITIVE | [2022/19] | French: | ADDITIF ALIMENTAIRE POUR ANIMAUX | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 02.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.08.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.09.2024 | Decision despatched | 14.11.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 14.11.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.11.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2011017367 (ANITOX CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * example 3 * * studies 4-6, 8 * * claims 1-3 * [Y] 1-11; | [XY]WO2012027140 (ANITOX CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10 * page 14, line 16 - line 18 * * formulations 1-8, 10, 11, 16, 19, 22-25, 27 * * examples 1-7 * [Y] 1-11; | [Y]WO2013081777 (ANITOX CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * examples 5, 6 * * claims 1, 3, 5 *; | [XY]WO2014195039 (BASF SE [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * page 1, line 1 - line 4 * * page 11, line 1 - page 14, line 7 * * compositions A, B * [Y] 1-11; | [Y]WO2015052672 (NUTRITION SCIENCES NV [BE]) [Y] 1-11 * page 8, line 24 - line 30 * * examples 1-3 * * claims 1-18 *; | [XY]CN107927416 (GUANGZHOU MERITECH BIO ENGINEERING TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10 * examples 5, 6 * * claim 9 * [Y] 1-11; | [Y] - E. HANCZAKOWSKA ET AL, "Short- and medium-chain fatty acids as a feed supplement for weaning and nursery pigs", POLISH JOURNAL OF VETERINARY SCIENCES, (20131201), vol. 16, no. 4, doi:10.2478/pjvs-2013-0092, pages 647 - 654, XP055621036 [Y] 1-11 * page 648, column 2, line 18 - line 29 * * page 649, column 2, line 14 - line 16 * * page 649, column 2, line 26 - line 33 * * table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2478/pjvs-2013-0092 | [Y] - GEOVANE R. OLIVEIRA ET AL, "Natural antimicrobials for control of Salmonella Enteritidis in feed and in vitro model of the chicken digestive process", JOURNAL OF ANIMAL PHYSIOLOGY AND ANIMAL NUTRITION., DE, (20190213), vol. 103, no. 3, doi:10.1111/jpn.13070, ISSN 0931-2439, pages 756 - 765, XP055621229 [Y] 1-11 * page 761, column 2, line 1 - line 2 * * table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jpn.13070 | [Y] - CHUNXIAO REN ET AL, "Immune Response of Piglets Receiving Mixture of Formic and Propionic Acid Alone or with Either Capric Acid or Bacillus Licheniformis after Escherichia coli Challenge", BIOMED RESEARCH INTERNATIONAL, (20190325), vol. 2019, doi:10.1155/2019/6416187, ISSN 2314-6133, pages 1 - 9, XP055621039 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2, column 2, line 1 - line 3 * * table 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2019/6416187 | [Y] - ., "Organic Acids", Germany, (20170308), pages 1 - 16, URL: https://products.basf.com/documents/pim;view/en/8873330059733.BASF%20Animal%20Nutrition%20OrganicAcids.pdf, (20190911), XP055621080 [Y] 1-11 * page 6 * | [Y] - N PASTER, "A Commercial Scale Study of the Efficiency of Propionic Acid and Calcium Propionate as Fungistats in Poultry Feed", POULTRY SCIENCE, Oxford, (19790501), vol. 58, no. 3, doi:10.3382/ps.0580572, ISSN 0032-5791, pages 572 - 576, XP055722463 [Y] 1-11 * page 572, column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 3 * * page 575, column 2, line 34 - line 38 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3382/ps.0580572 | [Y] - ., "Technical Data Sheet: Propionic Acid, Feed Grade", U.S.A., (20180228), pages 1 - 1, URL: https://productcatalog.eastman.com/tds/ProdDatasheet.aspx?product=71014130&pn=Propionic+Acid+-+Feed+Grade#_ga=2.62426412.166188504.1597328579-69911138.1597328579, (20200813), XP055722469 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * | [Y] - HUANG Y ET AL, "Evaluation of the efficacy of four weak acids as antifungal preservatives in low-acid intermediate moisture model food systems", FOOD MICROBIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD, LONDON, GB, vol. 27, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.FM.2009.07.017, ISSN 0740-0020, (20100201), pages 33 - 36, (20090724), XP026756019 [Y] 1-11 * page 36, column 1, line 18 - line 22 * * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fm.2009.07.017 |