EP3999293 - PANELS WITH A STRUCTURED COATING SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/21] | PANELS COMPRISING A STRUCTURED LACQUER SURFACE | ||
[2023/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzenta Paneele + Profile GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 18-20 56759 Kaisersesch / DE | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÜLLENKREMER, Felix Sebastianistraße 54 56076 Koblenz / DE | 02 /
HOFF, Egon Im Baspelt 21 56869 Mastershausen / DE | 03 /
BUHLMANN, Carsten Friedensallee 14 15834 Rangsdorf / DE | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20735620.5 | 07.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020EP69129 | Priority number, date | EP20190186795 | 17.07.2019 Original published format: EP 19186795 | [2022/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021008946 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3999293 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3999293 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B27N3/00, B05D1/38, B05D3/06, B05D7/08, B05D7/00, B27N7/00, B32B3/30, B44C1/24, B44C3/02, B44C5/04, B32B21/02, B32B21/14 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
B27N7/005 (EP,CN,US);
B32B21/02 (EP,CN);
B05D7/26 (US);
B05D3/007 (EP,CN);
B05D3/0466 (EP,CN);
B05D3/061 (EP,CN);
B05D3/067 (EP,CN,US);
B05D3/12 (EP,CN,US);
B05D7/57 (EP,CN);
B27N3/002 (EP,CN);
B27N7/00 (EP,CN);
B32B13/10 (EP);
B32B19/042 (EP);
B32B19/045 (EP);
B32B21/047 (EP);
B32B21/06 (EP);
B32B21/08 (EP);
B32B21/14 (EP,CN);
B32B27/06 (US);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/12 (EP);
B32B27/20 (EP);
B32B27/285 (EP);
B32B27/288 (EP);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B27/308 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/365 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B27/42 (US);
B32B29/002 (US);
B32B3/10 (EP);
B32B3/12 (EP);
B32B3/30 (EP,CN,US);
B32B5/022 (EP);
B32B5/18 (EP);
B32B7/12 (US);
B32B9/02 (EP);
B32B9/045 (EP);
B32B9/047 (EP);
B41F23/08 (US);
B44C1/227 (EP,CN);
B44C1/24 (EP,CN);
B44C3/02 (US);
B44C5/04 (EP,CN,US);
B44C5/0469 (EP,CN);
B05D3/0263 (US);
B05D7/574 (US);
B05D7/576 (US);
B32B2255/08 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2255/28 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2260/026 (EP);
B32B2260/028 (EP,CN);
B32B2260/046 (EP,CN);
B32B2262/062 (EP);
B32B2262/065 (EP);
B32B2262/08 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
B32B2264/067 (EP);
B32B2264/102 (EP);
B32B2264/104 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PANEELE MIT STRUKTURIERTER LACKOBERFLÄCHE | [2022/21] | English: | PANELS WITH A STRUCTURED COATING SURFACE | [2023/06] | French: | PANNEAUX À SURFACE DE PEINTURE STRUCTURÉE | [2023/06] |
Former [2022/21] | PANELS COMPRISING A STRUCTURED LACQUER SURFACE | ||
Former [2022/21] | PANNEAUX PRÉSENTANT UNE SURFACE DE VERNIS STRUCTURÉE | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 19.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6555177 (MAGNUSSON TRYGGVI [US], et al) [Y] 5,7,9,14 * claims 1,12 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 8 *; | [XYI]EP1454763 (KRONOTEC AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,5,6,10,12-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0012] - [0015] - [0019] , [0020]; claims 1,4,12,14-17,19-22 * [Y] 4-9,14 [I] 16; | [XI]EP2236313 (FLOORING TECHNOLOGIES LTD [MT]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] - [0024]; claims 1,8,9 * [I] 11-16; | [Y]EP2700508 (AKZENTA PANEELE & PROFILE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5-7,14 * paragraph [0037]; figure 1; example 1; claims 1,7,9,10,12 *; | [Y]US2016207064 (KUHN SANDRA [DE], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] - [0011] *; | [XI]CN106696578 (XIAO TINGCHAO) [X] 1,2 * figure 1; example 1; claims 1,2 * * page 1, lines 24-35,41 * * page 2, lines 10-27 * [I] 12,13; | [Y]EP3278982 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5,8,14* paragraphs [0059] - [0062] *; | [T] - Anonymous, "Maserung - Wikipedia", (20190213), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Maserung, (20200127), XP055662334 [T] * the whole document * |