EP3996673 - A METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF A GEL-FORMING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TheraVet SA Bâtiment Biotech 3 Avenue Jean Mermoz 32/ 1 6041 Charleroi / BE | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASTIANELLI, Enrico 41, Avenue de la Libération 1640 Rhode-Saint-Genèse / BE | 02 /
WINAND, Julie 2 rue aux Ruwales 5024 Marche les Dames / BE | 03 /
ENA, Sabrina 75, Rue de Marchienne 6110 Montigny le Tilleul / BE | 04 /
ZEIPPEN, Caroline 6, Chemin de Barsy 5370 Flostoy / BE | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Brantsandpatents bv Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | [2023/39] |
Former [2022/19] | Brantsandpatents bvba Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | Application number, filing date | 20735622.1 | 07.07.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020EP69142 | Priority number, date | EP20190184936 | 08.07.2019 Original published format: EP 19184936 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021005069 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3996673 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3996673 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/06, A61K9/00, A61K47/02, A61P19/00, A61K31/4168, A61K31/728, A61K33/06, A61K35/16, A61L27/36, A61L27/52, A61L27/54 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
A61L27/52 (EP,IL);
A61K9/06 (EP,CN,IL);
A61K9/08 (US);
A61K31/4168 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61K31/728 (EP,IL);
A61K33/06 (EP,IL);
A61K33/14 (US);
A61K33/42 (US);
A61K35/16 (EP,CN,IL);
A61K45/06 (CN,IL);
A61K47/02 (EP,CN,IL);
A61K47/18 (US);
A61K47/36 (CN,IL,US);
A61K47/46 (US);
A61K9/0024 (EP,IL);
A61L27/3616 (EP,IL);
A61L27/54 (EP,IL);
A61P19/00 (EP,IL);
A61P19/02 (CN,IL);
A61P19/04 (CN,IL);
A61P19/08 (CN,IL);
A61P29/00 (CN,IL);
A61K2300/00 (IL);
A61L2300/414 (EP,IL);
A61L2400/06 (EP,IL);
A61L2430/02 (EP,IL);
A61L2430/06 (EP,IL);
A61L2430/10 (EP,IL)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4168, A61K2300/00 (EP,CN);
A61K31/728, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/06, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K35/16, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP) |
Former IPC [2022/19] | A61K9/00, A61K9/06, A61K31/00, A61K35/00, A61K47/02, A61L27/00, A61P19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Extension states | BA | 12.01.2022 | ME | 12.01.2022 | Validation states | KH | 12.01.2022 | MA | 12.01.2022 | MD | 12.01.2022 | TN | 12.01.2022 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GELBILDENDEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2022/19] | English: | A METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF A GEL-FORMING COMPOSITION | [2022/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE FORMATION DE GEL | [2023/23] |
Former [2022/19] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE COMPOSITION GÉLIFIANTE | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 12.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 27.09.2023 | |
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
GR | 28.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2009016451 (BIOTECHNOLOGY INST I MAS D SL [ES]) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, lines 10-11 * * page 4, lines 33-35 * * page 5, lines 1-4 * * page 8, lines 29-35 * * page 9, lines 11-14 * * page 10, lines 3-16 * * page 13, lines 20-30 * * page 14, lines 1-9 * * page 15, lines 1-35 * * page 16, lines 7-14 *; | [Y]US2012171179 (PAK JAEWOO [KR]) [Y] 1-18 * page 2, paragraphs 24, 26 * * page 3, paragraphs 39, 47, 48 * * page 6, paragraphs 90, 101-105 - page 7; example 1 *; | [Y]WO2014035721 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 25 * * page 5, paragraphs 26, 27 * * page 6, paragraphs 30, 32 * * page 7, paragraph 35 * * page 8, paragraph 37 * * page 9, paragraph 43 *; | [Y]CN104587525 (SHENZHEN CHINA CAPTICAL BIOMEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [YP] - MUN-IK LEE ET AL, "A placebo-controlled study comparing the efficacy of intra-articular injections of hyaluronic acid and a novel hyaluronic acid-platelet-rich plasma conjugate in a canine model of osteoarthritis", JOURNAL OF ORTHOPAEDIC SURGERY AND RESEARCH, (20190918), vol. 14, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s13018-019-1352-1, XP055655871 [YP] 16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13018-019-1352-1 | [Y] - FABRIZIO RUSSO ET AL, "Platelet Rich Plasma and Hyaluronic Acid Blend for the Treatment of Osteoarthritis: Rheological and Biological Evaluation", PLOS ONE, (20160616), vol. 11, no. 6, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0157048, pages 1 - 12, XP055625964 [Y] 17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0157048 | [Y] - Pietro Gentile ET AL, "Use of Platelet Rich Plasma and Hyaluronic Acid in the Treatment of Complications of Achilles Tendon Reconstruction", World journal of plastic surgery, Iran, (20160501), pages 124 - 132, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC5003947/pdf/wjps-5-124.pdf, XP055729539 [Y] 18 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2009016451 | EP2185163 | US2012171169 | WO2013076160 | WO2014035721 | EP2900247 | - CUPAIOLO RGOVAERTS DBLAUWAERT MCAUCHIE P., "Performance evaluation of a new Stago@ automated haemostasis analyser: The STA R Max@ 2", Int J Lab Hematol., (20190000), vol. 41, no. 6, pages 731 - 737 |