EP4005326 - CONFLICT AVOIDANCE BETWEEN RANDOM ACCESS MESSAGES AND OTHER TRANSMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Yan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
LUO, Tao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
HOSSEINI, Seyedkianoush 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
DIMOU, Konstantinos 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
PEZESHKI, Hamed 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20735709.6 | 04.06.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020US36087 | Priority number, date | US201962877279P | 22.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962877279 P | US202016891722 | 03.06.2020 Original published format: US202016891722 | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021015863 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4005326 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/00, H04W74/08, H04L5/00 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP);
H04W74/006 (EP,CN);
H04W74/002 (CN,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W48/10 (US);
H04W48/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | KONFLIKTVERMEIDUNG ZWISCHEN DIREKTZUGRIFFSNACHRICHTEN UND ANDEREN ÜBERTRAGUNGEN | [2022/22] | English: | CONFLICT AVOIDANCE BETWEEN RANDOM ACCESS MESSAGES AND OTHER TRANSMISSIONS | [2022/22] | French: | ÉVITEMENT DE CONFLIT ENTRE DES MESSAGES D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE ET D'AUTRES TRANSMISSIONS | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 20.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP3048853 (ASUSTEK COMP INC [TW]); | [XYI]US2019069258 (JEON HYOUNGSUK [US], et al); |