EP3986195 - KNITTED COMPONENT WITH INSERTED ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nike Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIR, Adrian c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | 02 /
MOLYNEUX, James c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/17] | 01 /
MEIR, Adrian C/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | ||
02 /
MOLYNEUX, James C/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20735759.1 | 12.06.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020US37530 | Priority number, date | US201962863660P | 19.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962863660 P | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020257078 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3986195 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A43B1/04, A43B23/02, A43B3/00, A43C1/06, A43C11/00, A43C11/16, D04B15/80 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
A43B1/04 (EP,CN,US);
A43B23/02 (CN);
A43B23/024 (EP,US);
A43B3/34 (EP);
A43C1/06 (EP);
A43C11/00 (CN);
A43C11/008 (EP,US);
A43C11/16 (EP);
A43C11/165 (CN,US);
D04B1/123 (EP);
D04B15/56 (EP);
D04B15/80 (EP);
A43B23/0245 (US);
D10B2403/0243 (EP);
D10B2501/043 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | GESTRICKTES TEIL MIT EINGESETZTEN ELEMENTEN | [2022/17] | English: | KNITTED COMPONENT WITH INSERTED ELEMENTS | [2022/17] | French: | COMPOSANT TRICOTÉ PRÉSENTANT DES ÉLÉMENTS INSÉRÉS | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 02.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5615562 (ROELL FRIEDRICH [DE]); | [IA]US2004181972 (CSORBA JULIUS [SK]); | [A]WO2014085205 (NIKE INTERNATIONAL LTD, et al); | [XAYI]US2015059206 (LOVETT KRISTOPHER [US], et al); | [XAI]US2015296922 (RUSHBROOK THOMAS J [US], et al); | [IAY]US2018110298 (SCHNEIDER SUMMER L [US], et al); | [XAI]US2018168272 (DROEGE JOHN [US], et al) | by applicant | US2013145652 | US8522577 |