EP3999567 - ONE-PACK POLYURETHANE DISPERSIONS, THEIR MANUFACTURE AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings GmbH Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOEPPING, Tobias Glasuritstr. 1 48165 Münster / DE | 02 /
ZIHANG, Sylvia Glasuritstr. 1 48165 Münster / DE | 03 /
PODLASKI-PYZIK, Beate Glasuritstr. 1 48165 Münster / DE | 04 /
SPERBER, Kerstin Glasuritstr. 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Steffan & Kiehne Patentanwälte PartG mbB Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20737501.5 | 15.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020EP70037 | Priority number, date | EP20190186451 | 16.07.2019 Original published format: EP 19186451 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021009252 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3999567 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C08G18/10, C08G18/28, C08G18/34, C08G18/42, C08G18/66, C08G18/68, C08G18/73, C08G18/75, C08G18/79, C08G18/80, C09D175/04, C09D175/06 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
C08G18/286 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/0823 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G18/4263 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C09D175/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G18/348 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/4216 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G18/4288 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G18/6659 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/683 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/73 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/755 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/758 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/792 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/80 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/80 (CN,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | EINPACK-POLYURETHANDISPERSIONEN, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2022/21] | English: | ONE-PACK POLYURETHANE DISPERSIONS, THEIR MANUFACTURE AND USE | [2022/21] | French: | DISPERSIONS DE POLYURÉTHANE À UN SEUL COMPOSANT, LEUR FABRICATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 16.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007004856 (MAZANEK JAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-17* page 1;4, paragraphs 2,9-24;70,72-73 - pages 7-9;10ff, paragraphs 95-97,109; examples 15-17; claims 1,10-12 * | by applicant | US3082180 | US4105708 | US4293692 | EP0521928 | EP0574417 | DE4326670 | DE4328092 | DE19534361 | EP0791614 | DE19948004 | EP1171535 | US2007004856 | WO2015007427 | EP3083742 | EP3247755 | EP2341110 | - ROMPP LEXIKON LACKEDRUCKFARBEN, Einkomponenten-Lacke, Georg Thieme Verlag, (19980000), page 179 | - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Technology, (19850000), vol. 1, pages 752 - 789 |