EP3986859 - METHODS OF MAKING BEMPEDOIC ACID AND COMPOSITIONS OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esperion Therapeutics, Inc. 3891 Ranchero Drive Suite 150 Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COPP, Richard 10356 Kress Rd Pinckney, MI 48169 / US | 02 /
ABDELNASSER, Mohamed 7 Topaz Ct. New City, NY 10956 / US | 03 /
CIMARUSTI, Christopher M. 350 White Horse Pike Clementon, NJ 08021 / US | 04 /
LANE, Jonathan 4319 Bella Vista Dr Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 05 /
BARKMAN, Michael 145 S Buchanan Ave Louisville, CO 80027 / US | 06 /
AMIN, Rasidul 508 Ballad Creek Ct Cary, NC 27519 / US | 07 /
COOPER, Arthur John 7981 Hackberry Dr Mentor, OH 44060 / US | 08 /
GOPAL, Damodaragounder 483 Medway Rd Highland Heights, OH 44143 / US | 09 /
SELIG, Philipp Sankt-Peter-Strasse 25 4020 Linz / AT | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20737750.8 | 19.06.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020US38622 | Priority number, date | US201962864873P | 21.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962864873 P | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020257571 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3986859 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C315/00, C07C317/36, C07C51/09, C07C59/245, C07C67/307, C07C69/62, C07C67/313, C07C69/738, C07C67/31, C07C69/732, A61P3/06 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
A61P3/06 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C07C51/09 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/20 (CN);
C07C51/04 (IL,US);
A61K31/191 (KR);
A61K31/194 (KR);
C07C315/00 (EP,IL);
C07C315/04 (IL);
C07C51/42 (IL);
C07C51/43 (IL,KR);
C07C51/47 (IL);
C07C59/245 (KR);
C07C59/285 (IL,US);
C07C67/307 (EP,IL);
C07C67/31 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
C07C315/00, C07C317/36 (EP);
C07C51/09, C07C59/245 (EP);
C07C67/307, C07C69/62 (EP);
C07C67/313, C07C69/738 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BEMPEDOSÄURE UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAVON | [2022/17] | English: | METHODS OF MAKING BEMPEDOIC ACID AND COMPOSITIONS OF THE SAME | [2022/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION D'ACIDE BEMPÉDOÏQUE ET COMPOSITIONS DE CELUI-CI | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 22.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2023 | Observations by third parties | 15.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2004067489 (ESPERION THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al); | [YA]WO2018218147 (ESPERION THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | [Y]CN109721486 (LUNAN PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP CORP); | [XP]EP3666750 (SANDOZ AG [CH]); | [E]WO2020141419 (LUPIN LTD [IN]); | by applicant | US2018078518 | WO2018148417 | US2018338922 | WO2018218147 | WO2019US18356 | other | EP3986859 |