EP3909006 - GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACE FOR INSIGHTS ON VIEWING OF MEDIA CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp NEC Display Solutions, Ltd. 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0073 / JP | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENTURA, Richard c/o Sharp NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc. 3250 Lacey Road, Suite 500 Downers Grove, IL 60515 / US | 02 /
KASUGA, Hiroyuki c/o Sharp NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc. 3250 Lacey Road, Suite 500 Downers Grove, IL 60515 / US | 03 /
PLATT, Steven Keith c/o Sharp NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc. 3250 Lacey Road, Suite 500 Downers Grove, IL 60515 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
VENTURA, Richard Downers Grove, IL 60515 / US | ||
02 /
KASUGA, Hiroyuki Downers Grove, IL 60515 / US | |||
03 /
PLATT, Steven Keith Downers Grove, IL 60515 / US | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20738056.9 | 10.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020JP01624 | Priority number, date | US201962791089P | 11.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962791089 P | US201962823329P | 25.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962823329 P | US201916708043 | 09.12.2019 Original published format: US201916708043 | US201916708108 | 09.12.2019 Original published format: US201916708108 | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020145411 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909006 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06F3/0484, G06N20/00, H04N21/414, H04N21/4223, H04N21/442, H04N21/466, H04N21/81 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0201 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0246 (EP);
G06Q30/0259 (EP);
G06Q30/0272 (EP);
H04N21/41415 (EP);
H04N21/4223 (EP);
H04N21/44218 (EP);
H04N21/4532 (US);
H04N21/4622 (US);
H04N21/4667 (EP);
H04N21/4668 (EP);
H04N21/812 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | G06Q30/02, G06F3/0484 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | GRAFISCHE BENUTERSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR EINBLICKE IN MEDIENINHALTE | [2021/46] | English: | GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACE FOR INSIGHTS ON VIEWING OF MEDIA CONTENT | [2021/46] | French: | INTERFACE UTILISATEUR GRAPHIQUE POUR DES CONNAISSANCES SUR LA VISUALISATION DE CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 25.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008133342 (CRIOU NATHALIE [US], et al); | [X]US2012140069 (DING FENG [SG], et al); | [XI]US2013111512 (SCELLATO SALVATORE [GB], et al); | [I]WO2013151552 (INTEL CORP [US], et al); | [I]US2015281756 (SOON-SHIONG PATRICK [US], et al); | [XI]JP2016177410 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [I]US9747497 (SHARMA RAJEEV [US], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2001229084 (GLOBAL MEDIA ONLINE INC, et al); | [Y]JP2011008571 (SHUNKOSHA:KK); | [Y]JP2011233120 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JP2016071501 (HITACHI SYSTEMS LTD); | [X]JP2016177410 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]JP2018097465 (NEC DISPLAY SOLUTIONS LTD) |