EP3908662 - ENGINEERED TUBEROUS SCLEROSIS COMPLEX 2 POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Johns Hopkins University 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASS, David A. 113 Garland Hall 3400 N. Charles Street Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | 02 /
RANEK, Mark J. 113 Garland Hall 3400 N. Charles Street Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | 03 /
KOKKONEN, Kristen 113 Garland Hall 3400 N. Charles Street Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | 04 /
DUNKERLY-EYRING, Brittany 113 Garland Hall 3400 N. Charles Street Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
KASS, David A. Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | ||
02 /
RANEK, Mark J. Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | |||
03 /
KOKKONEN, Kristen Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | |||
04 /
DUNKERLY-EYRING, Brittany Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20738372.0 | 09.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020US12924 | Priority number, date | US201962790216P | 09.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962790216 P | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020146625 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3908662 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C12N5/077, A61K35/17, A61P11/06, A61P31/00, A61P33/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/02, // A61K38/00 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
C12N5/0657 (EP);
A61K35/17 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP,US);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | C12N15/113, C12N15/63, C12N5/10, A61K35/17, A61P11/06, A61P31/00, A61P33/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | MANIPULIERTE POLYPEPTIDE DES TUBERÖSEN SKLEROSE-KOMPLEXES 2 | [2021/46] | English: | ENGINEERED TUBEROUS SCLEROSIS COMPLEX 2 POLYPEPTIDES | [2021/46] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES DU COMPLEXE 2 DE LA SCLÉROSE TUBÉREUSE MODIFIÉS | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 13.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US9149506 (CHAKRABORTY TIRTHA [US], et al); | [A]US2016251410 (TIROSH BOAZ [IL], et al); | by applicant | US2016251410 |