EP3903308 - HIGH RESOLUTION AUDIO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Yang 90 Bell Pasture Ladera Ranch, California 92694 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
GAO, Yang Ladera Ranch, California 92694 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20738546.9 | 13.01.2020 | [2021/44] | WO2020US13301 | Priority number, date | US201962791822P | 13.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962791822 P | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020146869 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3903308 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/08, G10L25/90, // G10L19/005 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
G10L19/08 (EP,KR);
G10L19/09 (US);
G10L19/005 (EP,KR,US);
G10L25/90 (EP,KR,US);
G10L19/083 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | G10L19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Title | German: | AUDIOCODIERUNG MIT HOHER AUFLÖSUNG | [2021/44] | English: | HIGH RESOLUTION AUDIO CODING | [2021/44] | French: | CODAGE AUDIO À HAUTE RÉSOLUTION | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 01.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008154588 (GAO YANG [US]); | [A]GB2499505 (SKYPE [IE]) | International search | [Y]US2008033584 (ZOPF ROBERT W [US], et al); | [Y]US2017140769 (RAVELLI EMMANUEL [DE], et al) | by applicant | US2008154588 | GB2499505 |