EP3906570 - APPARATUS INCLUDING ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT FOR PROCESSING DIFFERENTIAL SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOON, Youngchang 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jaehyup 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Sangmin 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | 01 /
YOON, Youngchang Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Jaehyup Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Sangmin Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2021/45] | Application number, filing date | 20738659.0 | 10.01.2020 | [2021/45] | WO2020KR00446 | Priority number, date | KR20190003451 | 10.01.2019 Original published format: KR 20190003451 | [2021/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020145710 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3906570 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01F19/04, H01F27/28, H03F1/34 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H01F19/04 (EP,KR);
H01F27/29 (US);
H01F27/2804 (EP);
H01F5/00 (KR);
H03F1/347 (KR);
H03H7/0138 (US);
H03H7/06 (US);
H03H7/09 (EP);
H03H7/1783 (EP);
H03H7/38 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/45] | H01F19/04, H03F1/34, H01F5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT ELEKTRONISCHER SCHALTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG DIFFERENTIELLER SIGNALE | [2021/45] | English: | APPARATUS INCLUDING ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT FOR PROCESSING DIFFERENTIAL SIGNAL | [2021/45] | French: | APPAREIL CONTENANT UN CIRCUIT ÉLECTRONIQUE PERMETTANT DE TRAITER UN SIGNAL DIFFÉRENTIEL | [2021/45] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 15.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004227608 (NAKATANI TOSHIFUMI [JP], et al); | [X]US2007025043 (TERADA YUJI [JP], et al); | [X]US2011007438 (ITO TOMOKAZU [JP], et al) | International search | [AY]US2007240298 (TERROVITIS MANOLIS [US]) [A] 6-7 * See paragraphs [0005]-[0026] and figure 4. * [Y] 1-5,8-15; | [A]US2008174394 (LEE SHENG-YUAN [TW]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0029] and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2012262237 (KAWAKAMI TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0043]-[0079] and figures 1-12. *; | [A]KR101390701B [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0036] and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]US2014197916 (EL-TANANI MOHAMMED A [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,8-15 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0026] and figures 1-3. * | by applicant | US2004227608 | US2007025043 | US2011007438 |