EP3908007 - METHOD, SYSTEM, AND RELATED DEVICE FOR ADMINISTERING AN OPTICAL NETWORK UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/45] | METHOD, SYSTEM, AND RELATED DEVICE FOR ADMINISTERING OPTICAL NETWORK UNIT | ||
[2023/31] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHINA MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO., LTD. RESEARCH INSTITUTE 32 Xuanwumen West Street Xicheng District Beijing 100053 / CN | For all designated states CHINA MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS GROUP CO., LTD. 29, Jinrong Ave. Xicheng District Beijing 100032 / CN | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Xintian 32 Xuanwumen West Street, Xicheng District Beijing 100053 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Wenhui 32 Xuanwumen West Street, Xicheng District Beijing 100053 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Dechao 32 Xuanwumen West Street, Xicheng District Beijing 100053 / CN | [2024/23] |
Former [2021/45] | 01 /
HU, Xintian Beijing 100053 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHOU, Wenhui Beijing 100053 / CN | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Dechao Beijing 100053 / CN | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2021/45] | Application number, filing date | 20738942.0 | 07.01.2020 | [2021/45] | WO2020CN70742 | Priority number, date | CN20191013162 | 07.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910013162 | [2021/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020143639 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3908007 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3908007 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00, H04B10/272 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0067 (EP,CN);
H04B10/272 (EP);
H04Q2011/0064 (EP);
H04Q2011/0079 (CN);
H04Q2011/0086 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2021/45] | H04Q11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWALTUNG EINER OPTISCHEN NETZWERKEINHEIT | [2021/45] | English: | METHOD, SYSTEM, AND RELATED DEVICE FOR ADMINISTERING AN OPTICAL NETWORK UNIT | [2023/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ POUR ADMINISTRER UNE UNITÉ DE RÉSEAU OPTIQUE | [2021/45] |
Former [2021/45] | METHOD, SYSTEM, AND RELATED DEVICE FOR ADMINISTERING OPTICAL NETWORK UNIT | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2021 | Translation filed | 06.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 12.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014023366 (ZANG MEIYAN [CN], et al); | [A]EP3154222 (ZTE CORP [CN]) | International search | [A]US2004120326 (YOON HYEON-SIK [KR], et al); | [X]CN101594250 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101594250 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101924649 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN102833642 (WUHAN FIBERHOME NETWORKS CO); | [A]CN103354508 (SHANGHAI FEIXUN COMM CO LTD) |