EP3908467 - CLOSED-LOOP FEEDBACK PRINTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ball Corporation 10 Longs Peak Drive Broomfield, CO 80021-2510 / US | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Michael W. 153 Sunbeam Ct. Erie, Colorado 80516 / US | 02 /
STOWITTS, Adam P.S. 10743 W. 54th Pl. Arvada, Colorado 80002 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
MILLER, Michael W. Erie, Colorado 80516 / US | ||
02 /
STOWITTS, Adam P.S. Arvada, Colorado 80002 / US | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20738981.8 | 10.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020US13048 | Priority number, date | US201962791129P | 11.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962791129 P | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020146713 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3908467 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/407, B41J11/00, B41F33/00, B41F17/20 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
B41J3/40733 (EP,IL,US);
B41F17/20 (EP);
B41F33/0036 (EP);
B41J11/0015 (EP,IL);
B41J29/38 (US);
B41J2002/012 (EP,IL)
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | B41F33/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | RÜCKGEKOPPELTES DRUCKSYSTEM MIT GESCHLOSSENEM REGELKREIS | [2021/46] | English: | CLOSED-LOOP FEEDBACK PRINTING SYSTEM | [2021/46] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IMPRESSION À RÉTROACTION EN BOUCLE FERMÉE | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 24.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006193673 (BAKER RICHARD J [US], et al); | [XI]EP3175987 (I MER CO LTD [JP]); | [XDI]WO2017201398 (REXAM BEVERAGE CAN CO [US]); | [XI]US2018024076 (EFNER JOHN [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2005199151 (HOLTEN ERIK V [NL], et al); | [X]US2006193673 (BAKER RICHARD J [US], et al); | [A]US2012216689 (COCHRAN DON W [US], et al); | [A]US2017157964 (IZUME MASAYUKI [JP]); | [A]US2018222212 (MAYER JOSEF [DE], et al) | by applicant | US7044395 | WO2017201398 | US9873358 | US2018024076 | WO2018US51717 |