EP3890409 - POWER CONTROL METHOD AND POWER CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XUE, Yifan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Xingwei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 20738985.9 | 13.01.2020 | [2021/40] | WO2020CN71813 | Priority number, date | CN20191030629 | 11.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910030629 | [2021/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020143835 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3890409 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3890409 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/38, H04W52/24, H04W4/70, // H04W52/32 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
H04W52/383 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/242 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W52/146 (CN,US);
H04L5/0035 (US);
H04W4/70 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W52/14 (KR);
H04W52/36 (KR);
H04W76/23 (US);
H04W52/322 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/02] | H04W52/24, H04W52/38 | ||
Former IPC [2021/40] | H04W52/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR LEISTUNGSSTEUERUNG | [2021/40] | English: | POWER CONTROL METHOD AND POWER CONTROL APPARATUS | [2021/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE DE PUISSANCE ET APPAREIL DE RÉGLAGE DE PUISSANCE | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2021 | Translation filed | 28.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 09.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US9961487 (MIAO GUOWANG [US]) [Y] 1-4 * column 15, paragraph 8 - column 19, paragraph 51 *; | [E]EP3890410 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-4* paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0099]; figure 13 *; | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; Physical layer procedures for control (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 38.213, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20180901), no. V15.3.0, pages 1 - 101, XP051487512 [Y] 1-4 * chapter 7.1 (Uplink Power Control for Physical uplink shared cannel) * | International search | [A]CN103139889 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-53 * entire document *; | [A]CN104105181 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [A] 1-53 * entire document *; | [A]CN104488332 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-53 * entire document *; | [A]US2015156728 (KWON TAESOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-53* entire document *; | [X]CN107018564 (UNIV CHONGQING POSTS & TELECOM) [X] 1-53 * description, paragraphs [0066]-[0118] * | Examination | CN107018564 | - NOKIA ET AL, "Discussion on sidelink power control", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1714002 DISCUSSION ON SIDELINK POWER CONTROL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170820), XP051316794 |