Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021343302 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117373364 | 12.07.2021 | WO2020US13295 | 13.01.2020 | US201962791820 | 13.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102605961B | Global Dossier | 23.11.2023 | B1 | KR20210113342 | 15.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US13295 | 13.01.2020 | US201962791820 | 13.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7150996B | Global Dossier | 11.10.2022 | B2 | JP2022517232 | 07.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US13295 | 13.01.2020 | US201962791820 | 13.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113196387 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US13295 | 13.01.2020 | US201962791820 | 13.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3903309 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2024 | B1 | EP3903309 | 02.03.2022 | A4 | EP3903309 | 03.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US13295 | 13.01.2020 | US201962791820 | 13.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021013767 | 21.09.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US13295 | 13.01.2020 | US201962791820 | 13.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA202105028 | 28.04.2022 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2020US13295 | 13.01.2020 | US201962791820 | 13.01.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020146867 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962791820 | 13.01.2019 |