EP3903309 - HIGH RESOLUTION AUDIO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/17] |
Former [2021/44] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Yang 90 Bell Pasture Ladera Ranch, California 92694 / US | [2024/17] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
GAO, Yang Ladera Ranch, California 92694 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2021/44] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20739228.3 | 13.01.2020 | [2021/44] | WO2020US13295 | Priority number, date | US201962791820P | 13.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962791820 P | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020146867 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3903309 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3903309 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/00, G10L19/02, G10L19/08, G10L19/083, G10L19/09 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
G10L19/0204 (EP,KR,US);
G10L19/06 (US);
G10L19/08 (EP,US);
G10L19/083 (EP,KR);
G10L19/09 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | G10L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUDIOCODIERUNG MIT HOHER AUFLÖSUNG | [2021/44] | English: | HIGH RESOLUTION AUDIO CODING | [2021/44] | French: | CODAGE AUDIO À HAUTE RÉSOLUTION | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 17.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2015235653 (LIU ZEXIN [CN], et al) [X] 1,3,5,8-11 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0073]; figures 1,2,3 * [A] 4,6[I] 2,7 | International search | [Y]US6931373 (BHASKAR UDAYA [US], et al) [Y] 7, 15* (col. 10, In 18-22; col. 12, In 18-26) *; | [Y]US2010174535 (VOS KOEN BERNARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document (especially para [0039]-[0042], [0047], [0052]-[0057], [0060]-[0067], [0071]-[0072]) *; | [Y]US2011046946 (LIU ZONGXIAN [SG], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document (especially para [0078], [0088]-[0091], [0114]-[0119]) * | by applicant | US2015235635 |