EP3997852 - COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FACILITATING TRANSACTIONS ASSOCIATED WITH A BLOCKCHAIN USING A NETWORK IDENTIFIER FOR PARTICIPATING ENTITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states nChain Licensing AG Grafenauweg 6 6300 Zug / CH | [2022/37] |
Former [2022/19] | For all designated states Nchain Holdings Limited Fitzgerald House 44 Church Street St. John's / AG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WRIGHT, Craig Steven c/o Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | 02 /
DAVIES, Jack Owen c/o Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | 03 /
WAHAB, Jad Faisal c/o Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/19] | Fraser, Karen Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 20739467.7 | 03.07.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020IB56293 | Priority number, date | GB20190009960 | 11.07.2019 Original published format: GB 201909960 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021005474 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3997852 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L9/32, H04L29/12, G06Q20/22, H04L9/30 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H04L63/06 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L9/3263 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06Q20/3829 (CN);
G06Q20/38215 (US);
G06Q20/065 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06Q20/223 (EP,CN,KR);
G06Q20/3825 (CN);
H04L61/4511 (EP,KR);
H04L63/0428 (EP,KR);
H04L63/0823 (EP,KR);
H04L63/12 (EP,KR);
H04L9/0825 (US);
H04L9/083 (US);
H04L9/0861 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L9/321 (US);
H04L9/3239 (CN,KR,US);
H04L9/50 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q2220/00 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | COMPUTERIMPLEMENTIERTES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG VON TRANSAKTIONEN IN VERBINDUNG MIT EINER BLOCKCHAIN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES NETZWERKIDENTIFIKATORS FÜR TEILNEHMENDE EINHEITEN | [2022/19] | English: | COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FACILITATING TRANSACTIONS ASSOCIATED WITH A BLOCKCHAIN USING A NETWORK IDENTIFIER FOR PARTICIPATING ENTITIES | [2022/19] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ IMPLÉMENTÉS PAR ORDINATEUR POUR FACILITER DES TRANSACTIONS ASSOCIÉES À UNE CHAÎNE DE BLOCS À L'AIDE D'UN IDENTIFIANT DE RÉSEAU D'ENTITÉS PARTICIPANTES | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 26.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2018343114 (BEN-ARI ADI [GB]) [A] 18 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0095] *; | [A]US10320843 (DOBREK LUKASZ [US], et al) [A] 18 * column 1, line 1 - column 1, line 54 ** column 6, line 8 - column 7, line 10 *; | [IA] - Andreas M. Antonopoulos, "Mastering Bitcoin - Unlocking Digital Cryptocurrencies", Mastering bitcoin : [unlocking digital cryptocurrencies], Beijing Cambridge Farnham Köln Sebastopol Tokyo, O'Reilly Media, (20141220), ISBN 978-1-4493-7404-4, XP055306939 [I] 1-17,19-39 * page 1 - page 3 * * page 15 * * page 70 - page 71 * * page 89 - page 95 * * page 111 - page 117 * [A] 18 | [A] - Anonymous, "Developer Guide - Bitcoin", (20150511), pages 1 - 48, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20150511232019/https://bitcoin.org/en/developer-guide, (20181029), XP055519712 [A] 1-8,19-27,36-39 * page 30 * | [A] - GARBA A ET AL, "Analysis of man-in-the-middle of attack on bitcoin address", COMPENDEX, ENGINEERING INFORMATION, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, (2018), Database accession no. E20193507383027, XP002800029 [A] 1-8,19-27,36-39 * sections 1-3 and 5.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5220/0006864003880395 | [ ] - GARBA A ET AL, "Analysis of man-in-the-middle of attack on bitcoin address", ICETE 2018 - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 15TH INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON E-BUSINESS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS - ICETE 2018 - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 15TH INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON E-BUSINESS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS 2018 SCITEPRESS PRT, (2018), vol. 2, pages 388 - 395 | [A] - GIUSEPPE ATENIESE ET AL, "Certified Bitcoins", IACR, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CRYPTOLOGIC RESEARCH, (20140203), vol. 20140204:170250, pages 1 - 16, XP061015471 [A] 1-8,19-27,36-39 * page 1 - page 3 * | [A] - T. Aura, "Cryptographically Generated Addresses (CGA)", Cryptographically Generated Addresses (CGA), doi:10.17487/rfc3972, (20031001), URL: https://link.springer.com/content/pdf/10.1007/10958513_3.pdf, (20201012), XP055738755 [A] 9-17,28-35 * sections 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.17487/rfc3972 | [A] - MICHAL ZIMA, "Sending Money Like Sending E-mails: Cryptoaddresses, The Universal Decentralised Identities", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20161215), doi:10.4204/EPTCS.233.5, XP080744493 [A] 9-17,28-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4204/EPTCS.233.5 | by applicant | US5600725 | US5761305 | US5889865 | US5896455 | US5933504 | US6078667 | US6122736 | US6141420 | US6618483 | US6704870 | US6785813 | US6792530 | GB2561728 |