EP3917828 - KITE AND WING RIG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boards & More GmbH Rabach 1 4591 Molln / AT | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRÖSEL, Ralf c/o Boards & More GmbH Keltenring 9 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
GRÖSEL, Ralf 82041 Oberhaching / DE | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 20739988.2 | 13.07.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020EP69734 | Priority number, date | DE201910129493 | 31.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019129493 | [2021/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021083562 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3917828 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B63H8/12 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
B63H8/12 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | KITE UND FLÜGELRIGG | [2021/49] | English: | KITE AND WING RIG | [2021/49] | French: | PLANCHE AÉROTRACTÉE ET GRÉEMENT AILE | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 30.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/37] | 15.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4708078 (LEGAIGNOUX DOMINIQUE M [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 17 * * figure - *; | [A]US2006065787 (PETERSON ALEX [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] ** figure - *; | [I]US2009277997 (SHOGREN ALEXANDER [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 32] - [0035] * * figure - *; | [XI]US2014070055 (STIEWE PETER [DE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] - [0 23] - [0026] * * figure - * [I] 3-10 | by applicant | DE20201924U | US2006192055 | DE102016113858 | DE102019101656 |