EP3999136 - BONE CEMENT WITH HYALURONIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graftys Quai Sur Meuse 19 4000 Liège / BE | For all designated states Nantes Université 1 quai de Tourville 44035 Nantes Cedex 1 / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2023/36] |
Former [2022/38] | For all designated states Graftys Quai Sur Meuse 19 4000 Liège / BE | ||
For all designated states Universite de Nantes 1, quai de Tourville 44000 Nantes / FR | |||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2022/21] | For all designated states Graftys Rue d'Edimbourg 11B 6040 Jumet / BE | ||
For all designated states Universite de Nantes 1, quai de Tourville 44000 Nantes / FR | |||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASTIANELLI, Enrico Avenue de la Libération 41 1640 Rhode-Saint-Genèse / BE | 02 /
BOULER, Jean-Michel 11 rue des Gauteries 44470 Carquefou / FR | 03 /
BUJOLI, Bruno La Basse Bodinière 44240 Sucé-sur-Erdre / FR | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Icosa Europe Rue d'Oultremont 37 1040 Bruxelles / BE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20740033.4 | 17.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020EP70351 | Priority number, date | EP20190187320 | 19.07.2019 Original published format: EP 19187320 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021013748 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3999136 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/46, A61L24/00 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
A61L27/46 (EP,US);
A61L24/0084 (EP,US);
A61K6/864 (US);
A61K6/884 (US);
C04B12/02 (US)
| C-Set: |
A61L24/0084, C08L5/08 (EP);
A61L27/46, C08L5/08 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | KNOCHENZEMENT MIT HYALURONSÄURE | [2022/21] | English: | BONE CEMENT WITH HYALURONIC ACID | [2022/21] | French: | CIMENT OSSEUX AVEC ACIDE HYALURONIQUE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 21.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/27] | 05.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP1891984 (GRAFTYS [FR]); | [A]US2017312385 (AHN EDWARD S [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1891984 | WO2008023254 |