EP3909125 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE STATE OF AN ELECTRIC MOTOR, AND CORRESPONDING ELECTRIC MOTOR AND VENTILATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZIEHL-ABEGG SE Heinz-Ziehl-Strasse 74653 Künzelsau / DE | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBST, Raphael Simon Victoriastraße 2/1 74613 Öhringen / DE | 02 /
KRCMAR, Mato Mathias Hofgartenweg 25/1 74613 Öhringen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
OBST, Raphael Simon 74613 Öhringen / DE | ||
02 /
KRCMAR, Mato Mathias 74613 Öhringen / DE | Representative(s) | Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20740231.4 | 05.05.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020DE200032 | Priority number, date | DE201910208637 | 13.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019208637 | [2021/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020249167 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909125 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02P29/024, H02P29/60, H02K11/33, H02K9/06, H02K7/14, H02K11/20 | [2024/42] | CPC: |
H02P29/60 (EP);
H02K9/06 (EP,US);
H02K11/20 (EP,US);
H02K11/33 (EP);
H02K11/35 (US);
H02K7/14 (EP);
H02P29/024 (EP);
H02K2209/00 (US);
H02K2211/03 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | H02P29/60, H02K9/06, H02K9/24, H02K11/20, H02H5/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN EINES ZUSTANDS EINES ELEKTROMOTORS UND ENTSPRECHENDER ELEKTROMOTOR SOWIE VENTILATOR | [2021/46] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE STATE OF AN ELECTRIC MOTOR, AND CORRESPONDING ELECTRIC MOTOR AND VENTILATOR | [2021/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER UN ÉTAT D'UN MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE, MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE CORRESPONDANT ET VENTILATEUR | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 11.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |