EP3994014 - TYRE COMPRISING A MONITORING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli, 25 20126 Milano / IT | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSCAINO, Ivan Gildo C/O PIRELLI TYRE SPA VIALE PIERO E ALBERTO PIRELLI, 25 20126 MILANO / IT | 02 /
NATTA, Andrea C/O PIRELLI TYRE SPA VIALE PIERO E ALBERTO PIRELLI,25 20126 MILANO / IT | 03 /
PUPPI, Cristiano c/o Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli, 25 20126 MILANO / IT | 04 /
RUBINGH, Jan-Eric Jack Martijn Bosrand 3 5665 EC Geldrop / NL | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Tirloni, Bartolomeo BTA Srl 2nd floor Viale Papa Giovanni XXIII, 106 24121 Bergamo / IT | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20740425.2 | 24.06.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020IT50156 | Priority number, date | IT20190010899 | 04.07.2019 Original published format: IT201900010899 | [2022/19] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021001862 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3994014 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3994014 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
B60C23/041 (EP);
B60C23/0493 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFEN MIT EINER ÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/19] | English: | TYRE COMPRISING A MONITORING DEVICE | [2022/19] | French: | PNEU COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 27.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 16.08.2023 | |
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 16.08.2023 | |
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 16.11.2023 | |
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 16.11.2023 | |
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0906839 (BRIDGESTONE FIRESTONE INC [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0015]; figure 5 *; | [A]DE102007014097 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0016]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2018257442 (ELIAN KLAUS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0025] , [0033]; figures 2A,3; claims 1-13 *; | [Y] - POWERSTREAM, "Thin (1 mm to 2mm) to Ultrathin (0.5 mm) Rechargeable Lithium Polymer Cells from PowerStream", (20190415), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20190415133744/https://www.powerstream.com/thin-lithium-ion.htm, (20200206), XP055666030 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * |