EP4003694 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT OR FOR MODIFYING THE SURFACE STATE OF A PREFORMED OBJECT BY PHOTO-POLYMERISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3 rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states Universite d'Aix-Marseille (AMU) 58 Boulevard Charles Livon 13284 Marseille Cedex 07 / FR | For all designated states Ecole Centrale de Marseille Technopole de Château Gombert 38, Rue Frederic Joliot Curie 13013 Marseille / FR | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMRA, Claude 146 Chemin de Palama 13013 Marseille / FR | 02 /
ANDRE, Jean-Claude 27 rue de l'armée Patton 54000 Nancy / FR | 03 /
GALLAIS-DURING, Laurent 49 boulevard Pécout 84120 Pertuis / FR | 04 /
ZERRAD, Myriam 7 rue des Trois Mages 13001 Marseille / FR | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20740645.5 | 22.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020EP70623 | Priority number, date | FR20190008646 | 30.07.2019 Original published format: FR 1908646 | [2022/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021018677 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4003694 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/106, B29C64/135, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y70/00, G03F7/00, // B29C64/227, G03F7/027 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
B29C64/106 (EP,US);
B29C64/135 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP);
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
G03F7/0037 (EP);
B29C64/227 (EP);
B29K2033/08 (US);
B33Y80/00 (US);
G03F7/027 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/22] | B29C64/106, B29C64/135, B33Y70/00, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, G03F7/00, G03F7/027 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN OBJEKTES ODER ZUR MODIFIZIERUNG DES OBERFLÄCHENZUSTANDES EINES VORGEFORMTEN OBJEKTES DURCH FOTOPOLYMERISATION | [2022/22] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT OR FOR MODIFYING THE SURFACE STATE OF A PREFORMED OBJECT BY PHOTO-POLYMERISATION | [2022/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN OBJET TRIDIMENSIONNEL, OU DE MODIFICATION DE L'ÉTAT DE SURFACE D'UN OBJET PRÉFORMÉ, PAR PHOTO-POLYMÉRISATION | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 09.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/51] | 01.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1295179 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0024] , [0070] , [0071]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2006003313 (UNIV LOUIS PASTEUR U L P [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 4; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2018060617 (ECOLE CENTRALE MARSEILLE [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A] - BRETT E. KELLY ET AL, "Volumetric additive manufacturing via tomographic reconstruction", SCIENCE, US, (20190131), doi:10.1126/science.aau7114, ISSN 0036-8075, XP055550929 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.aau7114 | by applicant | - J.C. ANDRÉ, De la fabrication additive à l'impression 3D/4D, (20170331), page 36,37,41 | - YAGCI Y.JOCKUSCH S.TURRO N.J., "Photoinitiated Polymerization: Advances, Challenges, and Opportunities", Macromolecules, (20100000), vol. 43, doi:10.1021/ma1007545, pages 6245 - 6260, XP001556866 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma1007545 | - VON RAUMER M.SUPPAN P.JACQUES P., "Photoinduced charge transfer processes of triplet benzophenone in acetonitrile", J. Photochem. Photobiol., (19970000), vol. A105, pages 21 - 28 | FR20160059211 |