EP3911177 - NON-DAIRY ANALOGS AND BEVERAGES WITH DEAMIDATED PLANT PROTEINS AND PROCESSES FOR MAKING SUCH PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ripple Foods, PBC 901 Gilman Street Suite A Berkeley CA 94710 / US | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STILES, Amanda c/o RIPPLE FOODS, PBC 901 Gilman St., Suite A Berkeley, California 94710 / US | 02 /
HOMYAK, Celia c/o RIPPLE FOODS, PBC 901 Gilman St., Suite A Berkeley, California 94710 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
STILES, Amanda Berkeley, California 94710 / US | ||
02 /
HOMYAK, Celia Berkeley, California 94710 / US | Representative(s) | Hutter, Anton Venner Shipley LLP 5 Stirling House Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7RF / GB | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20741123.2 | 17.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020US14045 | Priority number, date | US201962794043P | 18.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962794043 P | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020150583 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911177 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23L7/10, A23L33/10, A23L33/17, A23L33/185, A23L2/52, A23L2/00, A23C11/02, A23C11/10, A23C11/06, A23J3/08, A23J3/34 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
A23L2/66 (EP,US);
A23J3/346 (US);
A23C11/06 (EP);
A23C11/103 (EP,US);
A23F5/243 (US);
A23J3/08 (EP);
A23J3/14 (US);
A23J3/343 (EP);
A23L11/60 (EP,US);
A23L2/60 (US);
A23L33/15 (US);
A23L33/16 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | A23L7/10, A23L33/10, A23L33/17, A23L33/185, A23L2/52, A23L2/00, A23C11/02, A23C11/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | MILCHFREIE ANALOGA UND GETRÄNKE MIT DEAMIDIERTEN PFLANZENPROTEINEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG SOLCHER PRODUKTE | [2021/47] | English: | NON-DAIRY ANALOGS AND BEVERAGES WITH DEAMIDATED PLANT PROTEINS AND PROCESSES FOR MAKING SUCH PRODUCTS | [2021/47] | French: | ANALOGUES NON LAITIERS ET BOISSONS CONTENANT DES PROTÉINES VÉGÉTALES DÉSAMIDÉS ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION DE TELS PRODUITS | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 25.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2022 | Observations by third parties | 17.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.06.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 16.06.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.06.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2000050887 (AMANO PHARMA CO LTD) [X] 1-5,10,12,14,15 * the whole document * [Y] 11 [I] 6-9,13; | [XYI]US2005037125 (MANINGAT CLODUALDO C [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10,12,14,15 * example 5 * [Y] 11 [I] 6-9,13; | [A]US2012058239 (PEREYRA RICARDO [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]US2015257403 (SANZ-VALERO JUAN [US], et al) [X] 1-12,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 13; | [Y]WO2017009100 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) [Y] 11 * figure 2; examples 1-5; claims 1-12 *; | [A]US2019000112 (KIZER LANCE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - INTHAWOOT SUPPAVORASATIT ET AL, "Optimization of the Enzymatic Deamidation of Soy Protein by Protein-Glutaminase and Its Effect on the Functional Properties of the Protein", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, US, (20110928), vol. 59, no. 21, doi:10.1021/jf2028973, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 11621 - 11628, XP055725996 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf2028973 | [A] - YONG YIE HUI ET AL, "Effects of Enzymatic Deamidation by Protein-Glutaminase on Structure and Functional Properties of [alpha]-Zein", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, US, (20041016), vol. 52, no. 23, doi:10.1021/jf040133u, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 7094 - 7100, XP055949847 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf040133u | International search | [Y]US2012058239 (PEREYRA RICARDO [US], et al) [Y] 31-32, 33/31-32* ; abstract; paragraphs [0013], [0017]; claim 3 *; | [XY]US2015257403 (SANZ-VALERO JUAN [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 3/1-2, 15-17, 18/15-17 * ; entire document, in particular abstract; paragraphs [0007]-[0009], [0028]-[0030], [0048]-[0051]; claims 8, 12, 15 * [Y] 31-32, 33/31-32; | [X]US2017318841 (TRIANTAFYLLOU ANGELIKI [GR]) [X] 23-25, 26/23-25 * ; paragraphs [0016], [0026], [0029], [0045]-[0047], [0061], table 1; claim 42 * | other | JP2000050887 | US2005037125 | - Food Business News, (20181127), page 48 | - Inthawoot Suppavorasatit, De Mejia Elvira Gonzalez, Cadwallader Keith R., "Optimization of the Enzymatic Deamidation of Soy Protein by Protein-Glutaminase and Its Effect on the Functional Properties of the Protein", Journal of Agricultural and Food Chemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US , (20111109), vol. 59, no. 21, doi:10.1021/jf2028973, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 11621 - 11628, XP055725996 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf2028973 | - YONG YIE HUI , YAMAGUCHI SHOTARO, MATSUMURA YASUKI, "Effects of enzymatic deamidation by protein-glutaminase on structure and functional properties of wheat gluten", Journal of Agricultural and Food Chemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US , (20060809), vol. 54, no. 16, doi:10.1021/JF060344U, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 6034 - 6040, XP002626965 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JF060344U | - Guan Jingtao, Takai Ryunosuke, Toraya Kohei, Ogawa Tomohisa, Muramoto Koji, Mohri Satoshi, Ishikawa Daitaro, Fujii Tomoyuki, Chi Hyun, Cho Seong-Jun, "Effects of Alkaline Deamidation on the Chemical Properties of Rice Bran Protein", FOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH, KARGER, BASEL, CH, CH , (20170101), vol. 23, no. 5, doi:10.3136/fstr.23.697, ISSN 1344-6606, pages 697 - 704, XP055913303 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3136/fstr.23.697 | - HAMADA J. S., MARSHALL W. E., "PREPARATION AND FUNCTIONAL PROPERTIES OF ENZYMATICALLY DEAMIDATED SOY PROTEINS.", Journal of Food Science, Wiley-Blackwell Publishing, Inc, US, US , (19890501), vol. 54., no. 3., doi:10.1111/j.1365-2621.1989.tb04661.x, ISSN 0022-1147, pages 598 - 601 + 635., XP000032272 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.1989.tb04661.x |