EP3911456 - ELONGATE TUBULAR STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techreo LLC 9736 Aspenknoll Court Loveland OH 45140 / US | For all designated states McNeil, Kevin 9736 Aspenknoll Court Loveland OH 45140 / US | For all designated states McNeil, Gregory, V. 11602 Sara Ann Drive Dewitt MI 48820 / US | For all designated states Fisher, Wayne, R. 923 Springbrook Drive Cincinnati OH 45224 / US | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCNEIL, Kevin 9736 Aspenknoll Court Loveland, OH 45140 / US | 02 /
MCNEIL, Gregory, V. 11602 Sara Ann Drive Dewitt, MI 48820 / US | 03 /
FISHER, Wayne, R. 932 Springbrook Drive Cincinnati, OH 45224 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
MCNEIL, Kevin Loveland, OH 45140 / US | ||
02 /
MCNEIL, Gregory, V. Dewitt, MI 48820 / US | |||
03 /
FISHER, Wayne, R. Cincinnati, OH 45224 / US | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | McQueen, Andrew Peter Miltons IP - Europe 5th Floor, Broad Quay House Prince Street Bristol BS1 4DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20741274.3 | 20.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020US14300 | Priority number, date | US201962794638P | 20.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962794638 P | US201962797426P | 28.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962797426 P | US201962815451P | 08.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962815451 P | US201962873124P | 11.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962873124 P | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020150720 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911456 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B21C37/15, B21C1/22, B21C37/08, B32B1/08, F16L9/04, F16L9/16, B21C37/20, B21C47/24, B21D5/14, B21D9/04, F16L13/00, F16L13/02, F16L13/10 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
F16L9/165 (EP);
F16L9/042 (US);
B21C37/154 (EP);
B21C37/205 (EP);
B21C47/247 (EP);
B21D5/14 (EP,US);
B21D9/04 (US);
F16L13/00 (EP);
F16L13/02 (EP);
F16L13/0254 (EP);
F16L13/103 (EP);
F16L59/143 (EP);
F16L9/006 (EP);
F16L9/045 (US);
F16L9/16 (EP);
B21D51/10 (EP);
F16L2201/44 (EP);
F16L53/00 (EP);
F16L58/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | B21C37/15, B21C1/22, B21C37/08, B32B1/08, F16L9/04, F16L9/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | LANGGESTRECKTE ROHRFÖRMIGE STRUKTUREN | [2021/47] | English: | ELONGATE TUBULAR STRUCTURES | [2021/47] | French: | STRUCTURES TUBULAIRES ALLONGÉES | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 08.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2104884 (QUARNSTROM BERT L) [I] 1,4-12,15 * figures 1-11 * * page 1, line 35 - page 3, line 60 * [Y] 2,3,13,14; | [IY]US2663324 (WENDELL FENTRESS DAVID) [I] 1,4-6,15 * figures 1-7 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 43 * [Y] 2,3,13,14; | [IY]US2772121 (MEISSNER MILTON F) [I] 1,4-6,15 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,13,14; | [Y]US3680584 (PIERART ROBERT) [Y] 2 * figures 1-5 ** column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 47 *; | [Y]US4652019 (VON AHRENS ROGER W [US]) [Y] 3,13,14 * figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 25 - column 5, line 5 * | International search | [A]US2004111863 (BINGGELI RUDOLF [CH]) [A] 1-21* entire document *; | [A]US2009288467 (BERG BERND [DE]) [A] 1-21 * entire document *; | [A]US2012073348 (PREHN ROLF [DE]) [A] 1-21 * entire document *; | [A]US2014311614 (EDMONDSON STEPHEN J [CA], et al) [A] 1-21 * entire document * |