EP3911728 - SCALABLE PRODUCTION AND CULTIVATION SYSTEMS FOR PHOTOSYNTHETIC MICROORGANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yemoja Ltd. Building Number 1 Tel-Hai Industrial Park 1210000 M.P. Upper Galilee / IL | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHKENAZI, Erez 347 HaMeyasdim Street Yesud HaMa'ala 210500 M.P. Upper Galilee / IL | 02 /
BAR-GIL, Amikam 10\1 Mivtsa Nakhshon Street 2198645 Karmiel / IL | 03 /
AVRON, Moshe 6 Barash Asher Street 14921400 Petach Tikva / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
ASHKENAZI, Erez 210500 M.P. Upper Galilee / IL | ||
02 /
BAR-GIL, Amikam 2198645 Karmiel / IL | |||
03 /
AVRON, Moshe 14921400 Petach Tikva / IL | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20741688.4 | 14.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020IL50058 | Priority number, date | US201962792539P | 15.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962792539 P | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020148756 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911728 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 23.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, C12M1/34, C12M1/26, C12N1/12 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
C12M21/02 (EP,KR,US);
C12M1/00 (IL);
C12M1/26 (IL);
C12M1/34 (IL);
C12M23/06 (KR,US);
C12M23/58 (EP,US);
C12M31/02 (EP,KR,US);
C12M41/06 (KR,US);
C12M41/12 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | SKALIERBARE HERSTELLUNGS- UND KULTIVIERUNGSSYSTEME FÜR FOTOSYNTHETISCHE MIKROORGANISMEN | [2021/47] | English: | SCALABLE PRODUCTION AND CULTIVATION SYSTEMS FOR PHOTOSYNTHETIC MICROORGANISMS | [2021/47] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE PRODUCTION ET DE CULTURE ÉVOLUTIFS POUR MICRO-ORGANISMES PHOTOSYNTHÉTIQUES | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: IL | 12.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 17.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 17.01.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 17.01.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.01.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.01.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 17.01.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.01.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.03.2023 | 31.01.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010279395 (HALEY III JOHN W [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-15 * paragraphs [0195] , [0203] , [0204] , [0216] - [0220] - [0276] - [0283] - [0377] , [0380] - [0383] - [0396] - [0399]; figures 1,85,102,103 * [I] 4,8; | [XI]US2015322392 (MARS FRANK [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0024] , [0031] , [0039] - [0042] - [0055] - [0059] - [0067] - [0069]; figures 1-4 *[I] 4,8 | International search | [A]US2009047722 (WILKERSON BRIAN D [US], et al) [A] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2012270304 (JOHNSON WAYNE L [US], et al) [Y] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012288917 (KRENBRINK DAVID DEAN [BB], et al) [A] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [A]CN202671529U (UNIV SHANGHAI OCEAN, et al) [A] 1-42* the whole document *; | [A]CN104988059 (UNIV BEIJING FORESTRY) [A] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [Y]AU2014250606B (PROTERRO INC [US]) [Y] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [A] - MIRON, ASTERIO SANCHEZ et al., "Comparative evaluation of compact photobioreactors for large-scale monoculture of microalgae", Journal of Biotechnology, (19991231), vol. 70, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0168-1656(99)00079-6, pages 249 - 270, XP004173406 [A] 1-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1656(99)00079-6 | by applicant | US2010279395 |