EP3912023 - A METHOD FOR GENERATING RANDOM NUMBERS IN BLOCKCHAIN SMART CONTRACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZeU Technologies, Inc. 230 Rue Notre-Dame Ouest Montreal, QC H2Y 1T3 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | For all designated states ZeU Technologies, Inc. 230 rue Notre-Dame Quest Montreal, QC H2Y 1T3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUMAS, Francois 12787 Bedford Montreal, Québec H9A 1C1 / CA | 02 /
QIAN, Yuming 99 Cartier Crescent Richmond Hill, Ontario L4C 2N3 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
DUMAS, Francois Montreal, Québec H9A 1C1 / CA | ||
02 /
QIAN, Yuming Richmond Hill, Ontario L4C 2N3 / CA | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20741818.7 | 20.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020CA50056 | Priority number, date | US201962794336P | 18.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962794336 P | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020146955 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3912023 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 23.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/58, G06F16/27, G06F21/64 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
G06F7/58 (EP,IL,KR);
G06F16/9024 (EP,IL,KR);
G06F21/64 (EP,IL,KR);
H04L9/0662 (EP,IL,KR);
H04L9/3239 (EP,IL,KR);
H04L9/3247 (EP,IL,KR);
H04L9/50 (EP,IL,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ZUFALLSZAHLEN IN INTELLIGENTEN BLOCKCHAIN-VERTRÄGEN | [2021/47] | English: | A METHOD FOR GENERATING RANDOM NUMBERS IN BLOCKCHAIN SMART CONTRACTS | [2021/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE NOMBRES ALÉATOIRES DANS DES CONTRATS INTELLIGENTS À CHAÎNE DE BLOCS | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 24.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2018104728 (QUANTA TECH LTD [GB]) [I] 1-15 * page 7, line 3 - page 13, line 17 *; | [I] - Randao.Org, "Randao: Verifiable Random Number Generation", (20170911), pages 1 - 24, URL: https://randao.org/whitepaper/Randao_v0.85_en.pdf, (20190521), XP055590669 [I] 1-15 * part III * | [IP] - CHATTERJEE KRISHNENDU ET AL, "Probabilistic Smart Contracts: Secure Randomness on the Blockchain", 2019 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BLOCKCHAIN AND CRYPTOCURRENCY (ICBC), IEEE, (20190514), doi:10.1109/BLOC.2019.8751326, pages 403 - 412, XP033572005 [IP] 1-15 * page 406, lines 8-25 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/BLOC.2019.8751326 | International search | [A]US2015188704 (TAKENAKA MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1 to 18* Whole document *; | [A]WO2017145019 (NCHAIN HOLDINGS LTD [AG]) [A] 1 to 18 * Whole document *; | [A]US2018191714 (JENTZSCH CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [A] 1 to 18 * Whole document * |