EP3999706 - CASSETTE COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/21] | CASSETTTE COVER | ||
[2024/12] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OBERTHUR CASH PROTECTION 3 bis Rue du Docteur Quignard 21000 Dijon / FR | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUSSARD, Philippe 8 Allée Victor Hugo 21490 Varois et Chaignot / FR | 02 /
BLOT, Florent 112 Avenue de la gare 21220 GEVREY-CHAMBERTIN / FR | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Oudin, Stéphane GUIU IP 10, rue Paul Thénard 21000 Dijon / FR | [2024/23] |
Former [2022/21] | Oudin, Stéphane JurisPatent - Cabinet Guiu 10, rue Paul Thénard 21000 Dijon / FR | Application number, filing date | 20742249.4 | 16.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020EP70184 | Priority number, date | FR20190008005 | 16.07.2019 Original published format: FR 1908005 | [2022/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021009303 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3999706 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3999706 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E05G1/14 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
E05G1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KASSETTENFACHDECKEL | [2024/12] | English: | CASSETTE COVER | [2024/12] | French: | COUVERCLE DE CASSETTE | [2022/21] |
Former [2022/21] | KASSETTENDECKEL | ||
Former [2022/21] | CASSETTTE COVER | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 10.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2975424 (OBERTHUR CASH PROT [FR]); | [A]WO2015136235 (PATRONUS HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) | by applicant | FR3040187 |