EP4010932 - PLANAR OPTOELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR GENERATING A MICROWAVE SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles - Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DIJK, Frédéric chez Thales Research & Technology 1 avenue Augustin Fresnel 91767 Palaiseau Cedex / FR | 02 /
JANKOWSKI, Andrzej chez Thales Research & Technology 1 avenue Augustin Fresnel 91767 Palaiseau Cedex / FR | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/32] | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2022/24] | Marks & Clerk France Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20742271.8 | 22.07.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020EP70651 | Priority number, date | FR20190008847 | 08.08.2019 Original published format: FR 1908847 | [2022/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021023511 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4010932 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4010932 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/101, H01Q23/00, H01Q9/16 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
H01L31/101 (EP);
H01Q23/00 (EP);
H01Q9/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/24] | H01L31/101, H01Q23/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLANARE OPTOELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES MIKROWELLENSIGNALS | [2022/24] | English: | PLANAR OPTOELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR GENERATING A MICROWAVE SIGNAL | [2022/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE PLANAIRE DE GÉNÉRATION D'UN SIGNAL HYPERFRÉQUENCE | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 28.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2324911 (SECR DEFENCE [GB]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US2014010547 (DONG LIMIN [CN], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014231627 (WAKATSUKI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [AD] - N. SHIMIZU ET AL, "Photodiode-integrated microstrip antenna array for subterahertz radiation", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS., US, (20060301), vol. 18, no. 6, doi:10.1109/LPT.2006.871131, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 743 - 745, XP055411789 [AD] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2006.871131 | by applicant | - SHIMIZU et al., "Photodiode-Integrated Microstrip Antenna Array for Subterahertz Radiation", IEEE Photonics technology letters, (20060315), vol. 18, no. 6, doi:10.1109/LPT.2006.871131, XP055411789 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2006.871131 |