EP3962318 - SUPPORT DEVICE FOR WHEELS OF TRANSPORTABLE CONTAINERS, SUCH AS TROLLEY CASES OR THE LIKE. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/10] | SUPPORT DEVICE FOR WHEELS OF TRANSPORTABLE CONTAINERS, SUCH AS TROLLEY CASES OR THE LIKE | ||
[2022/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schedoni Luxury Goods Srl Via Gandhi 44 41122 Modena / IT | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONINSEGNI, Alessio c/o SCHEDONI LUXURY GOODS srl Via Gandhi 44 41122 Modena / IT | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Bottino, Giovanni ARBO Srl Via Colombo, 11/29 16121 Genova / IT | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20742443.3 | 29.04.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020IB54037 | Priority number, date | IT20190006439 | 29.04.2019 Original published format: IT201900006439 | [2022/10] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020222137 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3962318 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3962318 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A45C5/14 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
A45C5/14 (EP,CN,KR);
A45C5/143 (EP,US);
A45C13/385 (KR);
F16F15/03 (CN);
A45C2005/148 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STÜTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR RÄDER VON TRANSPORTABLEN BEHÄLTERN, WIE Z.B. TROLLEY-KOFFER ODER DERGLEICHEN. | [2022/44] | English: | SUPPORT DEVICE FOR WHEELS OF TRANSPORTABLE CONTAINERS, SUCH AS TROLLEY CASES OR THE LIKE. | [2022/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOUTIEN POUR LES ROUES DES CONTENEURS TRANSPORTABLES, TELLES QUE CHARIOTS OU SIMILAIRES. | [2022/44] |
Former [2022/10] | STÜTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR RÄDER VON TRANSPORTABLEN BEHÄLTERN WIE ROLLKOFFERN ODER DERGLEICHEN | ||
Former [2022/10] | SUPPORT DEVICE FOR WHEELS OF TRANSPORTABLE CONTAINERS, SUCH AS TROLLEY CASES OR THE LIKE | ||
Former [2022/10] | DISPOSITIF SUPPORT POUR ROULETTES DE CONTENANTS TRANSPORTABLES, TELS QUE DES VALISES À ROULETTES OU SIMILAIRES | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 28.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.2023 | BG | 01.02.2023 | CZ | 01.02.2023 | DK | 01.02.2023 | EE | 01.02.2023 | ES | 01.02.2023 | FI | 01.02.2023 | HR | 01.02.2023 | IT | 01.02.2023 | LT | 01.02.2023 | LV | 01.02.2023 | MC | 01.02.2023 | PL | 01.02.2023 | RO | 01.02.2023 | RS | 01.02.2023 | SE | 01.02.2023 | SI | 01.02.2023 | SK | 01.02.2023 | SM | 01.02.2023 | IE | 29.04.2023 | LU | 29.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | NO | 01.05.2023 | GR | 02.05.2023 | IS | 01.06.2023 | PT | 01.06.2023 | [2024/51] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
IT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
MC | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SI | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
IE | 29.04.2023 | ||
LU | 29.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
MC | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SI | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
IE | 29.04.2023 | ||
LU | 29.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
MC | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SI | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
LU | 29.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
MC | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
LU | 29.04.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
LU | 29.04.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 01.02.2023 | |
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 01.02.2023 | |
LT | 01.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]CN108968276 (PINGHU YIHE LUGGAGE CO LTD) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2018360183 (STEINKRAUS WILLIAM EUN-SE [US]) [A] 1,10* abstract *; | [XAI]CN109203857 (PINGHU BENLUN LUGGAGE ACCESS CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,10 * the whole document * [A] 8 [I] 4,6,7,9 |