EP3969767 - TIE BOLT AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A TIE BOLT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poggipolini S.p.A. Via Emilia Levante, 262 40068 San Lazzaro di Savena / IT | [2024/32] |
Former [2022/12] | For all designated states Poggipolini S.p.A. Via Emilia Levante, 262 40068 San Lazzaro di Savena / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POGGIPOLINI, Stefano c/o Poggipolini S.p.A. Via Emilia Levante, 262 40068 San Lazzaro di Savena (BO) / IT | 02 /
POGGIPOLINI, Michele c/o Poggipolini S.p.A. Via Emilia Levante, 262 40068 San Lazzaro di Savena (BO) / IT | 03 /
BUOSO, Giancarlo c/o Poggipolini S.p.A. Via Emilia Levante, 262 40068 San Lazzaro di Savena (BO) / IT | 04 /
RAVAGLIA, Simone c/o Poggipolini S.p.A. Via Emilia Levante, 262 40068 San Lazzaro di Savena (BO) / IT | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A., et al Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2024/32] |
Former [2022/12] | Cataldi, Giulia, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 20742456.5 | 14.05.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020IB54584 | Priority number, date | IT20190006813 | 14.05.2019 Original published format: IT201900006813 | [2022/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020230083 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3969767 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3969767 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16B35/06, F16B37/14, F16B39/02, F16B39/30 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
F16B35/06 (EP);
F16B39/30 (EP,US);
F16B37/14 (EP,US);
F16B39/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANKERBOLZEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ANKERBOLZENS | [2022/12] | English: | TIE BOLT AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A TIE BOLT | [2022/12] | French: | BOULON D'ANCRAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN BOULON D'ANCRAGE | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 26.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US1346058 (GABRIEL RORERGEL); | [XI]US2985898 (GOUDE IRVING E); | [XI]US3517402 (COHEN GEORGE R); | [XI]US3611862 (WALKER RICHARD A); | [X]JP3057009U |