EP4010623 - DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUSLY SUPPLYING A CONSUMER WITH GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Messer GasPack GmbH Gahlingspfad 31 47803 Krefeld / DE | For all designated states Messer B.V. Middenweg 17 4782 PM Moerdijk / NL | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAERLAECKENS, Rudi Hinxelaar 18 2830 Blaasveld Belgien / BE | 02 /
VAN VOSSEN, Erik Deestraat 2 4693 CH Poortvliet, Niederlande / NL | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Münzel, Joachim R. Messer Group GmbH Messer-Platz 1 65812 Bad Soden / DE | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20742705.5 | 16.07.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020EP70150 | Priority number, date | DE20191005636 | 09.08.2019 Original published format: DE102019005636 | [2022/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021028146 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4010623 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4010623 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F17C7/00 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
F17C7/00 (EP,CN);
F17C2201/0114 (EP,CN);
F17C2201/032 (EP,CN);
F17C2201/056 (EP,CN);
F17C2201/058 (EP,CN);
F17C2205/0107 (EP,CN);
F17C2205/0142 (EP,CN);
F17C2205/0326 (EP,CN);
F17C2205/0335 (EP,CN);
F17C2221/011 (EP,CN);
F17C2221/013 (EP,CN);
F17C2221/014 (EP,CN);
F17C2221/016 (EP,CN);
F17C2221/018 (EP,CN);
F17C2221/03 (EP,CN);
F17C2221/032 (EP,CN);
F17C2223/0123 (EP,CN);
F17C2223/035 (EP,CN);
F17C2225/0123 (EP,CN);
F17C2225/033 (EP,CN);
F17C2227/042 (EP,CN);
F17C2250/032 (EP,CN);
F17C2250/043 (EP,CN);
F17C2250/0636 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Extension states | BA | 09.03.2022 | ME | 09.03.2022 | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR PERMANENTEN VERSORGUNG EINES VERBRAUCHERS MIT GAS | [2022/24] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUSLY SUPPLYING A CONSUMER WITH GAS | [2022/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR ALIMENTER EN PERMANENCE UN CONSOMMATEUR EN GAZ | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 09.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]DE885627 (ARAL AG B V); | [XD]DE102006002271 (LINDE AG [DE]) | by applicant | DE1501703 | DE1960448 | DE102006002271 | DE102007051927 |