EP3999483 - METHOD AND FACILITY FOR PRODUCING A TARGET COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde GmbH Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEISWINKEL, Andreas Hochfellnstraße 1 83253 Rimsting / DE | 02 /
ZANDER, Hans-Jörg Ludwigshöher Straße 42 81479 München / DE | 03 /
HAIDEGGER, Ernst Rosenstraße 19A 85521 Riemerling / DE | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/21] | DehnsGermany Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20742711.3 | 16.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020EP70191 | Priority number, date | DE201910119540 | 18.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019119540 | [2022/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021009307 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3999483 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/50, C07C47/02, C07C5/48, C07C11/04, C07C29/141, C07C31/10, C07C1/24, C07C11/06, C01B3/34 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
C01B3/48 (EP,US);
C07C29/141 (EP,US);
C01B3/34 (EP,US);
C07C1/24 (EP,US);
C07C45/50 (EP,US);
C07C5/48 (EP);
C01B2203/0238 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0283 (EP);
C01B2203/063 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1241 (EP,US);
C07C2523/20 (EP);
C07C2523/22 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C1/24, C07C11/06 (EP);
C07C29/141, C07C31/10 (EP);
C07C45/50, C07C47/02 (EP);
C07C5/48, C07C11/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ZIELVERBINDUNG | [2022/21] | English: | METHOD AND FACILITY FOR PRODUCING A TARGET COMPOUND | [2022/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSÉ CIBLE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 09.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004041763 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 9, lines 9-18 ** claim - *; | [A]WO2018005074 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 9, lines 13-19; figure 1 * * page 6, lines 9-25 * | by applicant | US6049011 | - BEI GREEN et al., Catal. Lett, (19920000), vol. 13, page 341 | - CAVANI et al., Catal, (20070000), vol. 127, page 113 | - MELZER et al., Angew. Chem., (20160000), vol. 128, page 9019 | - GÄRTNER et al., ChemCatChem, (20130000), vol. 5, page 3196 | - MOULIJNMAKEEVAN DIEPEN, "Hydroformylation", Chemical Process Technology, (20120000), page 235 | - WEISSERMELARPE, "Synthesis involving Carbon Monoxide", Industrial Organic Chemistry, (20030000), page 135 | - GEMÄß NAVID et al., Appl. Catal. A, (20140000), vol. 469, page 357 | - Gas Production: 2. Processes | - "Synthesis Gas", Weissermel & Arpe, Industrial Organic Chemistry, (20030000), vol. 15 | - SAN-JOSE-ALONSO et al., Appl. Catal. A, (20090000), vol. 371, page 54 | - SCHWAB et al., Chem. Ing. Tech., (20150000), vol. 87, page 347 | - M. BAERNS et al., "Beispiel 11.6.1: Hydrierung von Doppelbindungen", Technische Chemie, (20060000), vol. 439 | - "Propanols", Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry sowie Intratec Solutions | - "Ethylene Production via Ethanol Dehydration", Chemical Engineering, (20130000), vol. 120, page 29 |