EP4004176 - SWEET TASTING STARCH-DERIVED BEVERAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heineken Supply Chain B.V. Burgemeester Smeetsweg 1 2382 PH Zoeterwoude / NL | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OFODU, Ikechukwu Victor Burgemeester Smeetsweg 1 2382 PH Zoeterwoude / NL | 02 /
BEKKERS, Augustinus Cornelius Aldegonde Petrus @Albert Burgemeester Smeetsweg 1 2382 PH Zoeterwoude / NL | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20742751.9 | 23.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020EP70847 | Priority number, date | EP20190187830 | 23.07.2019 Original published format: EP 19187830 | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021013952 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4004176 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4004176 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12C12/02, C12G3/00 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
C12C12/02 (EP);
A23L2/38 (CN,US);
A23L2/382 (EP);
A23L2/52 (CN);
A23L2/60 (EP,CN,US);
C12C12/04 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/61, A23V2250/606, A23V2250/628, A23V2250/616, A23V2250/28, A23V2250/5482, A23V2250/5118 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SÜSS SCHMECKENDES STÄRKEABGELEITETES GETRÄNK | [2022/22] | English: | SWEET TASTING STARCH-DERIVED BEVERAGE | [2022/22] | French: | BOISSON DÉRIVÉE D'AMIDON AU GOÛT SUCRÉ | [2023/10] |
Former [2022/22] | BOISSON DÉRIVÉE D'AMIDON À GOÛT SUCRÉ | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 14.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SE | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | EE | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 18.10.2023 | |
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 18.10.2023 | |
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 19.01.2024 | |
IS | 18.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4765993 (OWADES JOSEPH L [US]) [Y] 1-11,14-17 * column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 5; examples 1-3 *; | [A]US5618572 (TRIPP MATTHEW L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 8; example 10 * * column 1, line 10 - line 12 *; | [Y]US2015017282 (FREDRIKSEN ANNE METTE BHATIA [DK], et al) [Y] 1-11,14-17 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0091]; example 2; table 2 * * paragraph [0091] *; | [A] - NIELS BINDESBØLL NIELSEN ET AL, "The fate of carbohydrates during fermentation of low calorie beer", CARLSBERG RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS., XX, (19851101), vol. 50, no. 6, doi:10.1007/BF02907155, ISSN 0105-1938, pages 325 - 332, XP055658883 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02907155 | Examination | US5439699 | WO2007144393 | by applicant | US4765993 | US2015017282 |