EP4003863 - DEVICE FOR CLOSING A THREADED NECK OF A CONTAINER PROVIDING TAMPER-EVIDENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACCOR Packaging GmbH Peter-Müller-Straße 16/16a 40468 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLIGH, Nick 29 Marshall Road Mapperly Nottingham NG3 6HS / GB | 02 /
RULAND, Helmut Heinrich-Doll-Straße 44 50189 Elsdorf / DE | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Düsseldorf Mönchenwerther Straße 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | Tilmann, Max Wilhelm, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Mönchenwerther Straße 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 20743144.6 | 23.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020EP70766 | Priority number, date | EP20190188510 | 26.07.2019 Original published format: EP 19188510 | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021018716 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4003863 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/34, B65D51/18, B65D55/02 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
B65D51/18 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0015 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0075 (EP,US);
B65D2401/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN EINER GEWINDEHALSES EINES BEHÄLTERS MIT ORIGINALITÄTSSICHERUNG | [2022/22] | English: | DEVICE FOR CLOSING A THREADED NECK OF A CONTAINER PROVIDING TAMPER-EVIDENCE | [2022/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE D'UN GOULOT FILETÉ D'UN RÉCIPIENT ASSURANT UNE INVIOLABILITÉ | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 25.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/25] | 21.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4378894 (WILLIS W COY, et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-11,14,15 * abstract * * column 1 - column 4 * [I] 7,13; | [A]US4801029 (BEGLEY DOUGLAS G [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XAI]US5975322 (REID GRAHAME W [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-12,14,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - line 10 * * column 2 * * column 3, line 7 - line 23 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 1 * * column 7 - column 8 * * column 9, line 32 - line 35 * [A] 4 [I] 7,8,13; | [A]US2009032488 (BECKMANN DAVID C [US], et al) [A] 7 * figures 1, 2 ** paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] *; | [XAI]WO2018136927 (RIEKE CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,9-11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0051] * [A] 6,7,14 [I] 8,12,13 | by applicant | US4747499 | US8596477 |