EP3994359 - PUMP DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/19] | PUMP ASSEMBLY | ||
[2024/25] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSB SE & Co. KGaA Johann-Klein-Straße 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUTHMANN, Lukas c/o KSB SE & Co. KGaA Johann-Klein-Str. 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2022/26] |
Former [2022/19] | 01 /
BUTHMANN, Lukas c/o KSB SE & Co. KGaA Johann-Klein-Str. 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | ||
02 /
GRÖSCHEL, Jürgen c/o KSB SE & Co. KGaA Johann-Klein-Straße 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | Application number, filing date | 20743594.2 | 01.07.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020EP68519 | Priority number, date | DE20191004538 | 01.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019004538 | DE20191008561 | 10.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019008561 | DE20201003929 | 30.06.2020 Original published format: DE102020003929 | DE20201003928 | 30.06.2020 Original published format: DE102020003928 | [2022/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021001422 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3994359 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/02 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
F04D29/588 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F04D29/426 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F04D29/026 (EP,CN,KR);
B22F10/25 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F12/38 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F12/53 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F5/10 (EP,CN,KR);
B33Y10/00 (EP,CN,KR);
B33Y80/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F04D1/00 (US);
F04D15/0263 (KR);
F04D29/586 (US);
B22D25/02 (US);
B22F10/28 (US);
F05D2230/211 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | PUMPENANORDNUNG | [2022/19] | English: | PUMP DEVICE | [2024/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POMPE | [2024/25] |
Former [2022/19] | PUMP ASSEMBLY | ||
Former [2022/19] | ENSEMBLE FORMANT POMPE | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 02.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]FR2008305 (EMU UNTERWASSERPUMPEN); | [XI]US3936220 (HENDERSON JAMES R); | [XI]FR2288891 (CAMIVA [FR]); | [X]US2005013689 (RACER DONALD W [US], et al); | [XI]US2006171801 (MANABE SEIJI [JP], et al); | [XI]US2007000648 (CROCKER MICHAEL T [US], et al); | [X]EP2713058 (PIERBURG PUMP TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]); | [XI]CN203867983U (ZHEJIANG HUAGONG AUTO PARTS CO LTD); | [XI]JP2015143476 (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC); | [XI]WO2016116428 (BASF SE [DE]); | [XI]US2016245291 (CARNES WILLIAM M [US]); | [X]WO2019023095 (CIRCOR PUMPS NORTH AMERICA LLC [US]) |