EP4182606 - A METHOD OF PREVENTING BLOCKAGE OF CIRCULATING BED MATERIAL IN A CIRCULATING FLUIDIZED BED REACTOR ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo SHI FW Energia Oy Metsänneidonkuja 10 02130 Espoo / FI | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KETTUNEN, Ari 79100 Leppävirta / FI | 02 /
HILTUNEN, Teri 79100 Leppävirta / FI | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Genip Oy Heikinkatu 7 48100 Kotka / FI | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 20743614.8 | 14.07.2020 | [2023/21] | WO2020EP69879 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022012742 | Date: | 20.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4182606 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4182606 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F23C10/30, F23C10/32, F23N1/00, F23N5/24 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
F23N1/002 (EP,KR,US);
F23C10/32 (EP,KR,US);
F23C10/24 (US);
F23C10/30 (EP);
F23N5/242 (EP,KR,US);
F23C2206/102 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERHINDERUNG DER BLOCKIERUNG VON ZIRKULIERENDEM BETTMATERIAL IN EINER ZIRKULIERENDEN WIRBELSCHICHTREAKTORANORDNUNG | [2023/21] | English: | A METHOD OF PREVENTING BLOCKAGE OF CIRCULATING BED MATERIAL IN A CIRCULATING FLUIDIZED BED REACTOR ARRANGEMENT | [2023/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉVENTION DU BLOCAGE D'UN MATÉRIAU EN LIT CIRCULANT DANS UN AGENCEMENT DE RÉACTEUR À LIT FLUIDISÉ CIRCULANT | [2023/21] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 06.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2005061654 (TSUKISHIMA KIKAI CO); | [A]KR101879637B ; | by applicant | US4075953 | US4544375 | EP1075626 | JP4254004B | JP4443481B | US8292977 | KR101879637B |