EP3999368 - THERMAL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING TWO COOLING CIRCUITS OF A THERMAL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vitesco Technologies GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESER, Gerhard c/o Vitesco Technologies GmbH Thomas-Dehler-Str. 27 81737 München / DE | 02 /
BRETTNER, Sebastian c/o Vitesco Technologies GmbH Thomas-Dehler-Str. 27 81737 München / DE | 03 /
DILLINGER, Manuel c/o Vitesco Technologies GmbH Thomas-Dehler-Str. 27 81737 München / DE | 04 /
FEULNER, Markus c/o Vitesco Technologies GmbH Thomas-Dehler-Str. 27 81737 München / DE | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Vitesco Technologies Landsberger Straße 187 - Haus D 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/21] | Vitesco Technologies Postfach 12 02 82019 Taufkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 20743647.8 | 17.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020EP70250 | Priority number, date | DE201910210576 | 17.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019210576 | [2022/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021009338 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3999368 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60K1/00, B60K11/02, F01P7/16, F01P3/12, F01P7/14 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
F01P7/165 (EP,CN);
B60L58/26 (CN);
H01M10/66 (US);
B60K1/00 (EP,US);
B60K11/02 (EP,CN,US);
B60K11/04 (CN);
B60L50/40 (US);
B60L58/27 (CN);
F01P3/12 (EP);
F01P3/20 (CN);
H01M10/613 (CN,US);
H01M10/615 (CN);
H01M10/625 (CN,US);
H01M10/6556 (US);
H01M10/6568 (CN,US);
H01M10/663 (CN);
H01M10/667 (CN);
H02K9/19 (US);
B60K2001/003 (EP);
B60K2001/005 (EP,CN,US);
B60K2001/006 (EP,CN,US);
B60K2001/008 (EP);
F01P2007/146 (EP);
F01P2050/24 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | THERMOMANAGEMENTSYSTEM, FAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN ZWEIER KÜHLKREISLÄUFE EINES THERMOMANAGEMENTSYSTEMS | [2022/21] | English: | THERMAL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING TWO COOLING CIRCUITS OF A THERMAL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2022/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION THERMIQUE, VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER DEUX CIRCUITS DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME DE GESTION THERMIQUE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 17.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP3088230 (ATIEVA INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,11,12 * paragraphs [0016] , [0021] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0037] * * figures 3-13 * [I] 3,4,8-10; | [A]WO2018028299 (NEXTEV LTD [CN]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]CN108437737 (JIANGSU JINTAN CHANGDANG LAKE NEW ENERGY TECH CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-12* figure 1 *; | [A]WO2019022023 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-7 * | by applicant | EP2392486 |