EP3977067 - METHOD FOR WEIGHING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I.M.A. Industria Macchine Automatiche S.p.A. Via Emilia 428-442 40064 Ozzano dell'Emilia (BO) / IT | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIANURA, Mattia c/o I.M.A. INDUSTRIA MACCHINE AUTOMATICHE S.P.A. Via Emilia, 428-442 40064 OZZANO DELL'EMILIA / IT | 02 /
TREBBI, Claudio c/o I.M.A. INDUSTRIA MACCHINE AUTOMATICHE S.P.A. Via Emilia, 428-442 40064 OZZANO DELL'EMILIA / IT | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20743865.6 | 19.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020IT50127 | Priority number, date | IT20190007266 | 27.05.2019 Original published format: IT201900007266 | [2022/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020240601 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3977067 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01G15/04, G01G17/00 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
G01G15/04 (EP,US);
G01G19/52 (CN);
G01G17/00 (EP);
G01G17/04 (US);
G01G21/22 (CN);
G01G2015/042 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM WIEGEN VON BEHÄLTERN | [2022/14] | English: | METHOD FOR WEIGHING CONTAINERS | [2022/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PESAGE DE CONTENANTS | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 14.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6148877 (BETHKE STEVEN D [US]); | [XYI]US2015034207 (BOIRA BONHORA JORDI [ES]); | [A]US2015353212 (WILLIAMSON ROBERT L [US]); | [YA]US2018229866 (EBERHARDT ALBERT [DE], et al); | [Y]US2019152724 (PHILIPP ANDRE [NL], et al) |