EP3928647 - COLD WEATHER GEAR WITH WADDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Montbell Co., Ltd. 2-2-2 Shinmachi Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TATSUNO, Isamu c/o Montbell Co., Ltd., 2-2-2 Shinmachi Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5500013 / JP | 02 /
MASAKI, Fumiaki c/o Montbell Co., Ltd., 2-2-2 Shinmachi Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | 03 /
TATSUNO, Takeshi c/o Montbell Co., Ltd., 2-2-2 Shinmachi Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | 04 /
TAKATORI, Hideo c/o Montbell Co., Ltd., 2-2-2 Shinmachi Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | 05 /
KASUMI, Tetsuji c/o Montbell Co., Ltd., 2-2-2 Shinmachi Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | [2023/51] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
TATSUNO, Isamu Osaka-shi, Osaka 5500013 / JP | ||
02 /
MASAKI, Fumiaki Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | |||
03 /
TATSUNO, Takeshi Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKATORI, Hideo Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | |||
05 /
KASUMI, Tetsuji Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20744629.5 | 20.01.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020JP01746 | Priority number, date | JP20190009991 | 24.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019009991 | [2021/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020153305 | Date: | 30.07.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3928647 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3928647 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A41D3/00, A47G9/08, A41D31/02, A41D31/06 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
A41D31/065 (EP,KR,US);
A41D3/00 (KR);
A41D31/10 (EP,KR,US);
A47G9/08 (KR,US);
A47G9/086 (EP);
A41D2400/10 (KR,US);
A47G9/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KALTWETTERGETRIEBE MIT WATTIERUNG | [2021/52] | English: | COLD WEATHER GEAR WITH WADDING | [2021/52] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT DE PROTECTION CONTRE LE FROID AVEC OUATE | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2021 | Translation filed | 24.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 12.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 20.12.2023 | |
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | HR | 20.12.2023 | |
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 20.12.2023 | |
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2000070098 (NIPPON YOHIN KK) [AD] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2016027215 (HIRAKAWA CORP) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] - [0224] , [ 237]; figures 1,5,26,36,37, 49 *; | [A]US9670054 (OZAWA ICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * figures 1,3,4,7,8 *; | [AD]JP2018080423 (DESCENTE LTD) [AD] 1-4* the whole document * | International search | [A]US4079568 (WORTMAN HAROLD) [A] 1-4* , abstract, fig. 2 *; | [Y]JPS56156817U (TOYO BUSSAN KK) [Y] 4 * , page 2, line 20 to page 3, line 8, fig. 2 *; | [A]JP2012067429 (KURASHIKI BOSEKI KK, et al) [A] 1-4 * , abstract, fig. 1 *; | [XY]JP2016027215 (HIRAKAWA CORP) [X] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0198]-[0242], [0276], fig. 31-42 * [Y] 1-4; | [Y]JP2016211107 (HIRAKAWA CORP) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0019]-[0053], fig. 1-12 *; | [A]JP2017532458 (PATAGONIA INC.) [A] 1-4 * , abstract, fig. 3B * | by applicant | JP2000070098 | JP2012067430 | JP2014226336 | JP2018080423 |