EP3916063 - ADHESIVE TAPE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NARIMATSU, Kiyoshirou c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 3535, Kurohama Hasuda-shi, Saitama 349-0198 / JP | 02 /
SHIBAYAMA, Junji c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 3535, Kurohama Hasuda-shi, Saitama 349-0198 / JP | 03 /
BANDOU, Akihiko c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 3535, Kurohama Hasuda-shi, Saitama 349-0198 / JP | 04 /
TAKANOHASHI, Youhei c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 3535, Kurohama Hasuda-shi, Saitama 349-0198 / JP | 05 /
KAMIYA, Nobuto c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 3535, Kurohama Hasuda-shi, Saitama 349-0198 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | 01 /
NARIMATSU, Kiyoshirou Hasuda-shi, Saitama 349-0198 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIBAYAMA, Junji Hasuda-shi, Saitama 349-0198 / JP | |||
03 /
BANDOU, Akihiko Hasuda-shi, Saitama 349-0198 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKANOHASHI, Youhei Hasuda-shi, Saitama 349-0198 / JP | |||
05 /
KAMIYA, Nobuto Hasuda-shi, Saitama 349-0198 / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 20744735.0 | 21.01.2020 | [2021/48] | WO2020JP01953 | Priority number, date | JP20190008672 | 22.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019008672 | [2021/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020153357 | Date: | 30.07.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3916063 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/29, C08K7/22, C09J7/38, C09J201/00 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
C09J7/29 (EP,US);
C09J7/38 (EP,US);
C08K7/22 (EP);
C09J2301/122 (EP,US);
C09J2301/208 (EP,US);
C09J2301/412 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/48] | C09J7/38, C09J5/08, C09J7/21, C09J201/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Title | German: | KLEBEBAND UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2021/48] | English: | ADHESIVE TAPE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2021/48] | French: | RUBAN ADHÉSIF ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2021/48] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2021 | Translation filed | 12.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 15.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6076584 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO) [X] 1,2 * claims 1-3 * * the whole document *; | [X]JPH02240182 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [X] 1,3 * claims 1-3 ** the whole document *; | [X]JP2000186258 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0019] , [0027]; claim 1 * | International search | [XY]JPS60203687 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO) [X] 1,4-8 * claims, page 1, lower left column, line 3 from the bottom to page 2, lower left column, line 14, examples * [Y] 6-7,9; | [XY]JPS61101578 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-5,8 * claims, page 1, lower right column, line 11 to page 2, upper right column, line 17 to page 2, lower left column, line 18, examples * [Y] 3,6-7,9; | [XY]JPS62263278 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO) [X] 1-2,4-5,8-9 * claims, page 2, upper left column, line 17 to page 2, upper right column, line 4, page 3, upper right column, lines 2-10, page 3, lower right column, lines 8-16, page 4, upper left column, line 1 to page 4, upper right column, line 5, examples, drawings * [Y] 3,6-7,9; | [XYA]JPH10140107 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,4-8 * claims, paragraphs [0019]-[0022], [0025]-[0030], [0033], examples, fig. 1-3 * [Y] 6-7,9 [A] 2-3,10-11; | [A]JP2000238225 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 10* claim 2, paragraphs [0012]-[0015] * |