Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
07.10.2022 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
25.03.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
25.03.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
16.02.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
11.02.2022 | Change - classification | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
11.02.2022 | Change - classification | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
26.01.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.10.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
29.10.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
05.10.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.07.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.07.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.07.2021 | Change - representative | |
02.07.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.08.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.08.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |