Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022102090 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019009547 | 23.01.2019 | WO2020JP00980 | 15.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7432825B | Global Dossier | 19.02.2024 | B2 | JPWO2020153181 | 02.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019009547 | 23.01.2019 | WO2020JP00980 | 15.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3916747 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2022 | A4 | EP3916747 | 01.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019009547 | 23.01.2019 | WO2020JP00980 | 15.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN215451206U | 07.01.2022 | U | Priority number | Date | JP2019009547 | 23.01.2019 | WO2020JP00980 | 15.01.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020153181 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019009547 | 23.01.2019 |